Swingless Golf Club Corporation v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Swingless Golf Club Corporation
Defendant: Roy H Taylor, James S Stowell, Jack Galanti, Mike Stringer, Centerfire Golf Company, New River Industries Corporation, Steve Fluke and EZee Golf, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv05574
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO RELEASE INJUNCTION re 139 First MOTION Release the Injunction per the terms of the Stipulated Judgment and Injunction filed by Roy H Taylor. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 22, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AT 1:30 P.M. ON SEPTEMBER 15. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE REGARDING MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER REGARDING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 3, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 REMINDER TO COUNSEL REGARDING UPCOMING TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Alsup granting 88 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MOTION TO STRIKE Show Cause Response due by 7/22/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 20, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO WAIVE ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 22, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 9, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 4, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 11, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by Noon on 8/19/2009. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 17, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 22, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 13, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER RE EXTENDED DEADLINE FOR PROPOSED SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 5, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 29, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO BEGIN MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 27, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swingless Golf Club Corporation v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swingless Golf Club Corporation
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy H Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Galanti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerfire Golf Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New River Industries Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Fluke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZee Golf, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?