Tackberry et al v. The County of Alameda et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tackberry and J.E.L.
Defendant: The County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Gregory Ahern, Santa Rita Jail, City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Steve Sweeney and Prison Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv05762
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING #94 REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS TO HIGHER INTEREST BEARING ACCOUNT. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for Court approval of minors funds to transfer to higher interest bearing account filed by Elizabeth Tackberry. Responses due by 7/5/2018. Replies due by 7/12/2018. (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO DEPOSIT SETTLEMENT FUNDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AMENDMENT TO ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE by Judge Alsup granting #87 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION AND APPOINTMENT OF GAURDIAN AD LITEM. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 90 AFFIDAVIT re #89 Proposed Order, #82 Amended Document, #87 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct for Administrative Relief to Amend Order Approving Minor's Compromise by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 89 Proposed Order re #88 Stipulation, #87 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct for Administrative Relief to Amend Order Approving Minor's Compromise by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 88 STIPULATION re #87 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct for Administrative Relief to Amend Order Approving Minor's Compromise by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 87 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct for Administrative Relief to Amend Order Approving Minor's Compromise filed by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 86 Proposed Order re #85 Affidavit, #84 Amended Document Application for Court Order Extending Time to Deposit Settlement Funds Pursuant to Order Approving Minor's Compromise by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 85 AFFIDAVIT re #84 Amended Document Declaration of Maria C. Jaime in Support of Application for Court Order Extending Time to Deposit Settlement Funds Pursuant to Order Approving Minor's Compromise by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 84 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Elizabeth Tackberry. Stipulation in Support of Application for Court Order Extending Time to Deposit Settlement Funds Pursuant to Order Approving Minor's Compromise. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 83 AFFIDAVIT re #82 Amended Document of Translator that the "Petition and Order for Substitution and Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem" and "Consent to Wthdraw as Guardian Ad Litem" was Translated from English to Spanish and Read in Spanish to the Petitioner by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
November 11, 2010 Filing 82 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Elizabeth Tackberry. Petition and Order for Substitution and Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 11/11/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Alsup granting #80 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 80 MOTION to Dismiss Prison Health Services, Inc. filed by J.E.L., Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 79 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (11/1/2010) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (10/18/2010 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/12/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS COUNTY OF ALAMEDA, GREGORY AHERN, SANTA RITA JAIL, AND ALAMEDA COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 29, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 Filing 77 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL; PROPOSED ORDER by The County of Alameda. (Sazama, Jill) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO REVISE PRIOR ORDER by Judge Alsup granting #74 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 75 STIPULATION re #74 MOTION Administrative Relief to Revise Order Approving Minor's Compromise by J.E.L., Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 74 MOTION Administrative Relief to Revise #73 Order Approving Minor's Compromise filed by J.E.L., Elizabeth Tackberry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 9/3/2010) Modified on 9/7/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 72 Declaration of Michael B. Ijams in Support of #70 Petition, Attorneys Fees re Minor's Comp filed byJ.E.L., Elizabeth Tackberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Ijams, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 17, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 70 PETITION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE against Gregory Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Prison Health Services, Inc., Santa Rita Jail, The County of Alameda ( Filing fee $350 ). Filed byJasmine Elizabeth Lopez, Elizabeth Tackberry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Maria C. Jaime in Support of petition, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Jaime Declaration)(Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 69 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 4/12/2010 by Mediator, Jonathan D. Schmidt; 2nd Mediation session held 4/9/2010; Case settled. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
March 8, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Mediation session set for 4/9/2010 at 10:00 AM at the Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Please come to ADR Reception on the 16th Floor to be directed tot he exact location of the session. Written statements due by 3/30/2010. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE IMMIGRATION PAROLE FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOVITA MUNOZ LOPEZ. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 9, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 67 STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF "PAROLE" FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM JOVITA MUNOZ LOPEZ BY U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, AND ORDER THEREON by Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez, Elizabeth Tackberry. (Ijams, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 29, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 24, 2009 Filing 65 Proposed Order Petition for Appointment of Guardian ad litem by Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez. (Ijams, Michael) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 64 NOTICE by Gregory Ahern, The County of Alameda NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (Sazama, Jill) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 63 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session by Mediator, Jonathan D. Schmidt; Mediation session held 12/1/2009; Phone discussions expected by 12/7/2009; Mediation process continues. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009) Modified on 12/4/2009 (cmf, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 11/23/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Michael B. Ijams (Ijams, Michael) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING EXTENSION OF THE MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 18, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 59 Proposed Order GRANTING EXTENSION OF THE MEDIATION DEADLINE by Gregory Ahern, The County of Alameda. (Sazama, Jill) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 58 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE MEDIATION DEADLINE by Gregory Ahern, The County of Alameda. (Sazama, Jill) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 13, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Pending Court approval, Mediation session re-set to 2/23/2010 at 10:00 AM at the Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Please come to ADR Reception on the 16th Floor to be directed to the exact location of the session. Written statements due by 2/16/2010. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 57 NOTICE by Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez, Elizabeth Tackberry CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Ijams, Michael) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 56 STATUS REPORT Joint Deposition Schedule by Gregory Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez, Prison Health Services, Inc., Santa Rita Jail, Elizabeth Tackberry, The County of Alameda. (Ijams, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS CITY OF LIVERMORE AND STEVE SWEENEY. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 24, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 54 Proposed Order and Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendants City of Livermore and Steve Sweeney by City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Steve Sweeney. (Cassidy, Terence) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION TO 12/1/2009. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/2/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 2, 2009 Filing 52 Proposed Order GRANTING EXTENSION OF THE MEDIATION DEADLINE by Gregory Ahern, The County of Alameda. (Sazama, Jill) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 2, 2009 Filing 51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE MEDIATION DEADLINE by The County of Alameda. (Sazama, Jill) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANT GREGORY AHERN FROM ATTENDING MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/31/2009. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 13, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 11/13/2009 at 10:00 AM at the Federal Building, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. Please come to ADR Reception on the 16th Floor to be directed to the exact location of the session. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 10, 2009 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on 8/11/2009 at 10:00 a.m. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
July 23, 2009 Filing 49 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Jonathan D. Schmidt as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 48 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/16/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/16/2009), Case referred to mediation. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR Unit for Mediation. Discovery due by 6/30/2010. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 9/9/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/16/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 46 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Initial Case Management Conference Statement filed by Prison Health Services, Inc.. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #44 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 16, 2009 Filing 44 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2009 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2009. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 9, 2009. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 42 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009) Modified on 6/9/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2009 Filing 41 Declination to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to United States District Judge by Prison Health Services, Inc. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 6/8/2009) Modified on 6/9/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2009 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Prison Health Services, Inc. (Attachments: *** #1 Supplement Declination to Proceed Before a Magistrate Jude and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #41 . *** )(Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 6/8/2009) Modified on 6/8/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2009 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint (with jury demand) by Prison Health Services, Inc. (Grigg, Matthew) (Filed on 6/3/2009) Modified on 6/4/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2009 Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/7/2009 01:30 PM. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #36 Stipulation Continuing the Initial Case Management Conference to 7/7/2009 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 5/19/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 37 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 5/18/2009) Modified on 5/19/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2009 Filing 36 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Elizabeth Tackberry, Gregory Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Jamine Elizabeth Lopez, Santa Rita Jail, Steve Sweeney and The County of Alameda. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 5/18/2009) Modified on 5/19/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #34 Stipulation to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference continued to 6/4/2009, 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 3/27/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) Modified on 3/30/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2009 Filing 34 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Initial Case Management Conference by Elizabeth Tackberry, Gregory Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez, Santa Rita Jail, Steve Sweeney, and The County of Alamada. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 3/26/2009) Modified on 3/27/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Steve Sweeney. (Cassidy, Terence) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 32 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Steve Sweeney. (Cassidy, Terence) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2009 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options. (Cassidy, Terence) (Filed on 3/11/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 Filing 29 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elizabeth Tackberry and Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elizabeth Tackberry and Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/9/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2009 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rockwell, Gregory) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by The County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Gregory Ahern, Santa Rita Jail (Sazama, Jill) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 25 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Gregory Ahern, Santa Rita Jail.. (Rockwell, Gregory) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 9, 2009 Filing 24 ANSWER to Amended Complaint for Damages for Wrongful Death; Violation of Civil Rights, 22 U.S.C. Sec. 1983; Negligence, Negligent Hiring - Jury Trial Demanded byThe County of Alameda, Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Gregory Ahern, Santa Rita Jail. (Rockwell, Gregory) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Steve Sweeney. (Cassidy, Terence) (Filed on 2/4/2009) Modified on 2/5/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elizabeth Tackberry and Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/21/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2009 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against all defendants. Filed by Elizabeth Tackberry and Jasmine Elizabeth Lopez. (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 1/20/2009) Modified on 1/21/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/21/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2009 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elizabeth Tackberry and Jasmine Elizabeth Lopes of summons and complaint (Jaime, Maria) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified on 1/20/2009 (kk, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department, Steve Sweeney. (Cassidy, Terence) (Filed on 1/15/2009) Modified on 1/16/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2008 Filing 17 CLERKS NOTICE Re: Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case No. 1:08-CV-976-OWWW-GSA. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 30, 2008 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 1:08-cv-00976. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 15, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 29, 2008 Filing 18 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2009. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2009 04:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 29, 2008 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS as to #14 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District, on *12/15/2008* to * U.S. District Court for the* *Northern District of CA* *450 Golden Gate Avenue* *San Francisco, CA 94102-3489*. *Electronic Documents: 1 to 14. *. (Hellings, J)
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION for Change of Venue and ORDER, signed by Judge Oliver W. Wanger on 12/12/08: CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of CA - Oakland Division; Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (CASE CLOSED) (Hellings, J)
December 12, 2008 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation for Change of Venue and Proposed Order by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Sodhi, Jakrun)
December 12, 2008 Filing 12 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Change of Venue by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Sodhi, Jakrun)
October 17, 2008 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** SECOND REQUEST The docket indicates that you docketed a proposed order, #8 , however you failed to also send it to Judge Wanger's order box so it could actually be signed. Please submit the document in Word or WordPerfect format to owworders@caed.uscourts.gov (Timken, A)
October 15, 2008 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** As there is a pending stipulation for change of venue in this matter, the scheduling conference currently set for 10/16/2008 has been vacated, pending order of the Court. (Timken, A)
October 15, 2008 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** The docket indicates that you docketed a proposed order, #8 , however you failed to also send it toJudge Wangers order box so it could actually be signed. Please submit the document in Word or WordPerfect format to owworders@caed.uscourts.gov (Timken, A)
October 3, 2008 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Elizabeth Tackberry. (Sodhi, Jakrun)
August 26, 2008 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by Elizabeth Tackberry. Attorney Jaime, Maria C. added. (Jaime, Maria)
July 11, 2008 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2008 at 08:15 AM in Courtroom 3 (OWW) before Judge Oliver W. Wanger. (Attachments: #1 Consent Forms, #2 VDRP Forms) (Esteves, C)
July 11, 2008 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *The County of Alameda, Santa Rita Jail, Steve Sweeney* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Jakrun Singh Sodhi* *P O Box 3030* *1300 K Street, Second Floor* *Modesto, CA 95353*. (Esteves, C)
July 11, 2008 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alameda County Sheriff's Department, Gregory Ahern, City of Livermore, Livermore Police Department* with answer to complaint due within *20* days. Attorney *Jakrun Singh Sodhi* *P O Box 3030* *1300 K Street* *Modesto, CA 95353*. (Esteves, C)
July 11, 2008 RECEIPT number CAE100003744 by Jakrun Singh Sodhi for Elizabeth Tackberry, Filing Fee, in the amount of $350.00. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Martin, S)
July 10, 2008 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Elizabeth Tackberry (Sodhi, Jakrun)
July 10, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all plaintiffs by Elizabeth Tackberry. Attorney Sodhi, Jakrun Singh added.(Sodhi, Jakrun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tackberry et al v. The County of Alameda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Tackberry
Represented By: Jakrun Singh Sodhi,
Represented By: Jineen Tara Espinosa
Represented By: Maria C. Jaime
Represented By: Michael B. Ijams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.E.L.
Represented By: Jakrun Singh Sodhi,
Represented By: Jineen Tara Espinosa
Represented By: Maria C. Jaime
Represented By: Michael B. Ijams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County of Alameda
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Represented By: Michael B. Ijams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Represented By: Michael B. Ijams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ahern
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Represented By: Michael B. Ijams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rita Jail
Represented By: Gregory J. Rockwell
Represented By: Jill Sazama
Represented By: Michael B. Ijams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Livermore
Represented By: Terence J. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livermore Police Department
Represented By: Terence J. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sweeney
Represented By: Terence J. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew M. Grigg
Represented By: Michael B. Ijams
Represented By: Nancy Eaton Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?