Endzweig v. Walmart.com USA LLC. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Sarah Endzweig
Defendant: Walmart.com USA LLC., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Netflix, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00111
Filed: January 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2009 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE Effective September 14, 2009, Judge Phyllis Hamilton's courtroom and chambers will be located in the Oakland Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 3rd floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612.On or after September 14, 2009, all filings for matters pending on Judge Hamiltons docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers' copies of documents must be made at the Oakland Courthouse.The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged.Please note that all of Judge Hamilton's case files will be moved to the Oakland Courthouse, therefore all cases numbers assigned to her will be changed slightly to reflect the correct venue. Previously, all case numbers started with "3:" to indicate the San Francisco office (Example: 3:09-cv-12345-PJH). As of September 14th, 2009, all of Judge Hamilton's case files will begin with "4:" to indicate the Oakland office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 4:09-cv-12345-PJH). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 09-12345 (YY-NNNNN).For information on the Oakland Courthouse's accessibility, parking, driving directions, public transit, hotels and other helpful links, please visit our website: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov, click on "Court Information" on the right hand side of our main page, then select the Oakland link under "Address and Jurisdiction". The main telephone number for the Oakland Division is 510 637-3530. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/7/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Certain Plaintiffs by Sarah Endzweig (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Caldes, William) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
May 5, 2009 Filing 32 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 31 Supplement to Pretrial Order No. 1. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/30/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CENTRALIZATION OF RELATED CASES IN MDL NO. 2029. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 20, 2009 Filing 29 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/09/2009, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRETRIAL ORDER NO.1. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/13/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 13, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2009 02:30 PM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 Filing 27 RENUNCIATION. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/10/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
April 9, 2009 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2009 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 4/9/2009). Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2009. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2009 02:30 PM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/9/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER POSTPONING ADR CASE FILING REQUIREMENTS UNTIL THE ISSUES ARE ADDRESSED AT THE UPCOMING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/2/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009) Modified on 4/2/2009 (nah, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2009 Filing 24 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Endzweig. (Barile, Peter) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
April 1, 2009 Filing 23 STIPULATION re 22 ADR Clerks Notice by Sarah Endzweig. (Barile, Peter) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 25, 2009 Filing 22 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 16, 2009 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2009 01:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2009. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying (97) Motion in case 3:09-cv-00002-PJH. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Eggleton on behalf of Netflix, Inc. (Eggleton, Keith) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Sher on behalf of Netflix, Inc. (Sher, Scott) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Netflix, Inc. (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Netflix, Inc. Defendant Netflix, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Certification of Interested Persons Under Local Civil Rule 3-16 (Jacobson, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 5, 2009 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Endzweig. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 1/12/2009, answer due 2/2/2009. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
February 2, 2009 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND by Walmart.com USA LLC., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Morrissey, Stephen) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/2/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
February 2, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2009. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2009 02:30 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2009)
January 16, 2009 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Endzweig. Walmart.com USA LLC. served on 1/12/2009, answer due 2/2/2009. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RELATING CASE. C-09-002 PJH AND C-09-111 JCS ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 16, 2009 Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 15, 2009 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Endzweig. Netflix, Inc. served on 1/12/2009, answer due 2/2/2009. (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sarah Endzweig re 8 Declaration in Support, 7 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 8 Declaration of Christopher T. Heffelfinger in Support of 7 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed bySarah Endzweig. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Sarah Endzweig. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Relating Cases)(Heffelfinger, Christopher) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by Jan. 27, 2009. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE that the Initial Case Management Conference prev. set for 4/17/9 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 4/24/2009 at 01:30 PM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2009. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2009. Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2009 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 CMC Standing Order, # 2 JCS Standing Order, # 3 New Standing Order)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Walmart.com USA LLC., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Netflix, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons by Sarah Endzweig (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009) (gba, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2009 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Walmart.com USA LLC., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Netflix, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611027430). Filed by Sarah Endzweig. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009) (gba, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Endzweig v. Walmart.com USA LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Endzweig
Represented By: Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart.com USA LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?