Virgin America, Inc. v. Adrants Publishing, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Virgin America, Inc.
Defendant: Adrants Publishing, LLC, Steve Hall, Angela Natividad and Nina Aldredge
Case Number: 3:2009cv00337
Filed: January 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Trademark Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCKETED INTO WRONG CASE. DISREGARD THIS ENTRY. Detention ORDER Pending Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bommer on 12/23/2009. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Virgin America, Inc. (Rassam, Mashhood) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 30, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Virgin America, Inc. (Rassam, Mashhood) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2009 04:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2009. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 26, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
January 26, 2009 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 4/27/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 5/4/2009 at 4:00 AM..(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Adrants Publishing, LLC, Steve Hall, Angela Natividad & Nina Aldredge. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringement, False Designation of Origin & False & Deceptive Advertising, Trademark Dilution, False & Misleading Statements Dilution in Violation of California Law & Defamation; Demand for Jury Trial & Certification of Interested Entities or Persons - [Summons Issued] against Adrants Publishing, LLC, Steve Hall, Angela Natividad & Nina Aldredge,[Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611028014] Filed by Virgin America, Inc..(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Virgin America, Inc. v. Adrants Publishing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgin America, Inc.
Represented By: Mashhood Rassam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrants Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Natividad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nina Aldredge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?