March 18, 2013 |
Filing
188
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 18, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
|
January 25, 2013 |
Filing
180
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OVERSIZED BRIEF. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
|
October 26, 2012 |
Filing
166
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs shall file the Fourth Amended Complaint no later than October 31, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing
165
ORDER VACATING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. The Further Status Conference currently scheduled for September 21, 2012 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
151
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEVEN LEZELL WOODROW PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 22, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing
147
ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. The telephonic status conference is continued from January 13, 2012 to February 17, 2012. A Joint Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than February 10, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 9, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
|
November 29, 2011 |
Filing
145
ORDER STRIKING DECEMBER 2, 2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING JANUARY 13, 2012 STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 29, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
|
October 18, 2011 |
Filing
142
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from October 21, 2011 to December 2, 2011, and a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed on or before November 23, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 18, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
|
September 19, 2011 |
Filing
140
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference on the calendar for September 23, 2011 is continued to October 21, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
|
July 19, 2011 |
Filing
136
ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF SUBSTITION. Patterson Law Group, APC is substituted in place and in stead of Harrison, Patterson & O'Connor LLP, as counsel for plaintiff Mark Winkler. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
|
July 8, 2011 |
Filing
134
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference on the Court calendar for July 15, 2011 is continued to August 26, 2011, and a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed on or before August 19, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
132
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference on the calendar for June 3, 2011 is continued to July 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 24, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
|
April 4, 2011 |
Filing
130
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference on the calendar for April 15, 2011 is continued to June 3, 2011, and a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed on or before May 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 4, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
|
February 4, 2011 |
Filing
128
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 11, 2011 to April 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 4, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
|
November 19, 2010 |
Filing
125
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference on the Court's calendar for December 3, 2010 is continued to February 11, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing
123
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference calendared for October 29, 2010 is continued to December 3, 2010, and a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed on or before November 24, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 18, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
|
October 6, 2010 |
Filing
120
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT. Defendant's time to answer the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint is extended through and including October 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
|
September 1, 2010 |
Filing
116
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 31, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
|
August 30, 2010 |
Filing
114
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED/CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Citibank's motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: a. Counts II and VII are dismissed; b. To the extent Count III includes a claim based on Citibank's not reinstating Winkler's access to the full credit limit, Count III is dismissed; and c. In all other respects, the motion is denied. In the event plaintiffs seek to amend any or all of the dismissed counts, plaintiffs are directed to file a Third Amended/Consolidated Class Action Complaint no later than September 20, 2010. If plaintiffs elect not to further amend, the instant action will proceed on the remaining claims in the SAC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 30, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
|
August 25, 2010 |
Filing
111
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 10, 2010 to October 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
|
August 3, 2010 |
Filing
108
ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED/ CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 3, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
|
July 12, 2010 |
Filing
104
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 16, 2010 to September 10, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed on or before September 3, 2010. Pla intiffs shall file their opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss by July 19, 2010, and defendant shall file its reply by July 27, 2010. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer for Maxine M. Chesney on July 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing
91
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY EVAN M. MEYERS PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
|
March 12, 2010 |
Filing
87
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 19, 2010 to April 23, 2010. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than April 16, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing
77
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COUNTS II AND VI; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 23, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
|
December 3, 2009 |
Filing
70
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; DISCOVERY ORDERS. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 4, 2009 to March 19, 2010. The hearing on the motion to dismiss is cont inued from January 8, 2010 to February 26, 2010; pursuant to the parties' request, plaintiff's opposition shall be filed no later than January 15, 2010, and defendant's reply shall be filed no later than February 12, 2010.Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2009) Modified on 12/7/2009 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF).
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing
67
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DEFENDANT'S CHICAGO COUNSEL TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DECEMBER 4, 2009. Defendant's Chicago counsel is permitted to appear at the December 4, 2009 Case Management Conference by telephone, provided local counsel is prepared to discuss all issues raised by the Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 1, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
|
September 17, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Counts I, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, and X in the complaint are dismissed. To the extent Cou nts IV and XI include a claim for injunctive relief, Counts IV and XI are dismissed. Citibank's motion to strike certain portions of the complaint is granted. In the event Levin seeks to amend any or all of the dismissed counts, Levin is ordere d to file a First Amended Complaint no later than October 9, 2009. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 25, 2009 to December 4, 2009; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 17, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/17/2009 (mmclc1, COURT STAFF).
|
August 25, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER VACATING AUGUST 28, 2009 HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 25, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
|
June 11, 2009 |
Filing
42
ORDER WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANT CITIBANK'S MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF RULE 12(F) MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. The Clerk shall remove Document #37 from the docket. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 11, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
|
May 15, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAY EDELSON PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 15, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
|
April 6, 2009 |
Filing
13
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DEBRA BOGO-ERNST PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 6, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
|