Salcido v. Wong
Petitioner: Ramon Bojorquez Salcido
Respondent: R.K. Wong
Case Number: 3:2009cv00586
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 64 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR PETITIONER TO FILE STATE EXHAUSTION PETITION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING 55 RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING 58 PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2013. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND OPPOSITION TO PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING EXHAUSTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 30, 2013.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 56 STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR A STAY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 15, 2013.(mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURAL MATTERS RELATED TO THE MIXED FINALIZED PETITION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE: BITTAKER PROTECTIVE ORDER; DIRECTIONS TO PETITIONER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 32 PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STRIKE; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 29, 2012.(mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 13, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO LODGE THE STATE COURT RECORD. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE 7 PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING AND FOR STAY OF FEDERAL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 9, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING EXECUTION OF DEATH SENTENCE AND REFERRING THE MATTER TO THE SELECTION BOARD FOR SUGGESTION OF APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/10/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salcido v. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon Bojorquez Salcido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R.K. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?