Amparo v. Adams et al
Petitioner: |
Marcos Amparo |
Respondent: |
Derral G. Adams and Matthew Cate |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00801 |
Filed: |
February 24, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
Habeas Corpus (General) Office |
County: |
Kings |
Presiding Judge: |
Maxine M. Chesney |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 12, 2012 |
Filing
27
ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 12, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
|
March 30, 2012 |
Filing
23
ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 30, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
|
July 8, 2011 |
Filing
21
ORDER GRANTING 20 PETITIONER'S SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 8, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
|
April 29, 2011 |
Filing
18
ORDER GRANTING 16 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
|
January 26, 2011 |
Filing
15
ORDER SCHEDULING FILING OF TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
|
October 22, 2010 |
Filing
14
ORDER GRANTING 13 EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing
12
ORDER DENYING 3 LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED PETITION; DIRECTING PETITIONER TO ELECT TO PROCEED WITH OR STAY PETITION; GRANTING 10 PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR COPIES; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK AND RESPONDENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 2, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
|
August 26, 2009 |
Filing
2
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Matthew Cate is hereby DISMISSED as a respondent to this action. The Clerk shall serve by certified mail a copy of this order, the petition and all attachments thereto on respondent and respondent's counsel, the Attorney Gen eral for the State of California. Respondent shall file with the Court and serve on petitioner, within ninety (90) days of the date this order is filed, an answer conforming in all respects to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, showing cause why a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted based on petitioner's cognizable claims. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 26, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?