Smith v. City of Rohnert Park et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Smith
Defendant: City of Rohnert Park, Ted Giesige and Robert Lankford
Case Number: 3:2009cv00825
Filed: February 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2010 Filing 41 STIPULATION For Dismissal by Plaintiffs as to Entire Action by Patricia Smith. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 4, 2010 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2010 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/4/2010) re #33 First MOTION for Hearing on Petition for Minor's Compromise filed by Patricia Smith. Motion taken under submission. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE by Judge Alsup granting #33 First MOTION for Hearing on Petition for Minor's Compromise. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 37 Proposed Order Approving Minor's Compromise by Patricia Smith. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #33 First MOTION for Hearing on Petition for Minor's Compromise, #34 Brief Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise, #35 Declaration of Patricia Smith, by Patricia Smith (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 10/29/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 35 Declaration of Patricia Smith In Support of #33 Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise filed by Patricia Smith. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 10/29/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 34 Brief Petition for Approval of Minor's Compromise filed byPatricia Smith. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 33 First MOTION for Hearing on Petition for Minor's Compromise filed by Patricia Smith. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CLARIFYING ORDER RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 27, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE [re #30 Stipulation filed by Patricia Smith]. Petition for approval of minor's compromise due by 10/29/2010. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/26/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and Order to Vacate Trial Date Pursuant to Settlement by Patricia Smith. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/1/2010 02:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by NOON on 11/1/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 28 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (11/15/2010) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (11/1/2010 at 2:00 PM). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/12/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 27 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 3/23/10. The case did not settle. (Date Filed: 3/23/2010). (Court Reporter n/a.) (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/23/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge James Larson. Notice of Settlement Conference set for 3/23/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/7/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 31, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 27, 2009 Filing 24 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by City of Rohnert Park, Ted Giesige, Robert Lankford. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 23 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/20/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/20/2009), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Larson for Settlement Conference. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2010 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2010 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James Larson for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 7/30/2010. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 9/9/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/20/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 21 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT of Plaintiffs and Defendants filed by City of Rohnert Park, Ted Giesige, Robert Lankford. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 20 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Jury Trial Demanded byCity of Rohnert Park, Ted Giesige, Robert Lankford. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #18 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE Scheduling CMC on Reassignment. Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2009 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2009. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/7/09. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 7, 2009 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 5, 2009 Filing 15 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by City of Rohnert Park, Ted Giesige, Robert Lankford. (Mitchell, Steven) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patricia Smith. Service waived by Robert Lankford waiver sent on 3/30/2009, answer due 5/29/2009. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patricia Smith. Service waived by Ted Giesige waiver sent on 3/30/2009, answer due 5/29/2009. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 27, 2009 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patricia Smith. Service waived by City of Rohnert Park waiver sent on 3/30/2009, answer due 5/29/2009. (Altenberg, George) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 11 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City of Rohnert Park. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 10 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Robert Lankford. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS on First Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Ted Giesige.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted Filed by Plaintiff Patricia Smith as to Defendant Ted Giesige. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted Filed by Plaintiff Patricia Smith as to Defendant Robert Lankford. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted Filed by Plaintiff Patricia Smith as to Defendant City of Rohnert Park. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH GENERAL ORDER 53. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/3/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages & Demand for Jury Trial against City of Rohnert Park, Ted Giesige & Robert Lankford. Filed by Plaintiff Patricia Smith. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 2 Consent to Act as Guardian Ad Litem and Proposed Order submitted by Patricia Smith. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons(es) issued against City of Rohnert Park, Ted Giesige, Robert Lankford (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611029265). Filed by Patricia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 25, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Rohnert Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Smith
Represented By: George Bernard Altenberg, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rohnert Park
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Giesige
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lankford
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?