Simon v. Adzilla, Inc [New Media] et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Susan Simon
Defendant: Adzilla, Inc [New Media], Conducive Corporation, Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc and Core Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00879
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 24, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 23, 2010 Filing 78 STIPULATION and Request for Dismissal of Entire Action by Adzilla, Inc [New Media]. (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 4, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated: Prior Case Management Conference of 1/29/10 Administratively Terminated. All Other Deadlines/Hearings Remain Pending.*** (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2010 10:30 AM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference, currently scheduled for March 12, 2010, is continued to April 9, 2010. The Parties' joint Case Management Conference Statement is due April 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 4, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 3, 2010 Filing 76 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Second Case Management Conference by Adzilla, Inc [New Media]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
February 25, 2010 Filing 75 MEDIATOR'S REPORT TO COURT by Rodney A. Max of Upchurch Watson White & Max. E-filed as per Chambers (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2010. Case Management Conference Continued for 3/12/2010 10:30 AM. Re 74 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The deadline to complete private mediation is continued to February 26, 2010, and the Case Management Conference is continued to March 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 22, 2010 Filing 73 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Second Case Management Conference by Adzilla, Inc [New Media]. (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. Michael J. Aschenberger is terminated as counsel for plaintiff in this proceeding. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 22, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE by Susan Simon of Disassociation and Withdrawal of Alan Himmelfarb as Counsel (Himmelfarb, Alan) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 70 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Susan Simon. Motion Hearing set for 2/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE by Susan Simon Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Kamber, Scott) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 68 NOTICE by Susan Simon Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation (Stampley, David) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DAVID A. STAMPLEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 17, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Filing 66 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney David A. Stampley to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611038934.) filed by Susan Simon. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Parisi and Suzanne Havens Beckman (Parisi, David) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
October 9, 2009 Filing 64 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/9/2009 before Maxine M. Chesney (Date Filed: 10/9/2009), Case referred to Private ADR.. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2010 10:30 AM. (Not Reported.) (tl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/9/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 63 STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Core Communications, Inc.. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 62 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED JOINTLY BY SIMON AND ADZILLA filed by Adzilla, Inc [New Media]. (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
August 19, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 8/19/09. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to October 9, 2009. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL VISINET BROADBAND, LLC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 18, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 Filing 59 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re 56 Order, to continue August 21, 2009 CMC by Susan Simon. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2009) Modified on 8/25/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2009 Filing 58 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order voluntarily dismissing defendant Continental VisiNet Broadband, LLC by Susan Simon. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled to 8/19/09 at 10:00 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Filing 57 ADR Clerks Notice Re-Setting the further ADR Phone Conference on 8/18/09 at 9:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER RE: STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. If the parties wish to pursue their request for a continuance, they shall submit, no later than August 18, 2009, additional information in support thereof. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 12, 2009 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference that was scheduled for 8/13/09 has been taken off calendar. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 11, 2009 Filing 55 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re 39 Order continuing August 21, 2009 CMC by Susan Simon. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2009) Modified on 8/12/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Hearing date of 8/7/9 at 9:30 AM before Judge Spero is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/6/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 5, 2009 Filing 53 STIPULATION re 43 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, Memorandum in support of; Proposed Order, 48 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, by Susan Simon. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
July 28, 2009 Filing 52 Reply to Opposition re 43 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, Memorandum in support of; Proposed Order filed bySusan Simon. (Himmelfarb, Alan) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 16, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo. Motion Hearing Continued for 8/28/2009 09:00 AM. Re 50 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 51 Memorandum in Opposition re 43 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, Memorandum in support of; Proposed Order filed byCore Communications, Inc.. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REGARDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL VISINET BROADBAND LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE. Plaintiff shall have until August 7, 2009 to respond to the motion. The hearing on the motion is set for August 28, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 49 STIPULATION re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo by Susan Simon. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Himmelfarb, Alan) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Hearing set for 8/7/9 at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom A, 15th Floor,San Francisco, re: 43 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery. Opposition due 7/20/9; reply due 7/28/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/15/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 9, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 8, 2009 Filing 47 Letter Brief filed by Attorney Michael Aschenbrener for plaintiff Susan Simon re: staying the hearing scheduled for 7/10/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY; VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT CORE COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 45 REPLY to 44 Response to Motion to Dismiss filed byCore Communications, Inc.. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 6/26/2009) Modified on 6/30/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 Filing 44 Memorandum in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) filed bySusan Simon. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 43 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, Memorandum in support of; Proposed Order filed by Susan Simon. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Aschenbrener, Michael) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 15, 2009 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adzilla, Inc [New Media] (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 Filing 41 DEFENDANT ADZILLA, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAdzilla, Inc [New Media]. (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Michael J. Aschenbrener is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 6/10/09. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 8/13/09 at 10:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 9, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2009. Case Management Conference Continued for 8/21/2009 10:30 AM. Re 39 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to August 21, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 9, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Core Communications, Inc. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 38 MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Michael J. Aschenbrener to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611032999.) filed by Susan Simon. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 8, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 6/8/2009 was not held. ADR Program has rescheduled the ADR Phone Conference to 6/10/2009 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel should initiate the call as previously scheduled. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED JOINTLY filed by Susan Simon, Adzilla, Inc [New Media], Core Communications, Inc.. (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 4, 2009 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Conducive Corporation by Susan Simon (Himmelfarb, Alan) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
June 2, 2009 Filing 34 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/8/09 at 1:30 p.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 33 Declaration of BRET L. MINGO in Support of 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) filed byCore Communications, Inc.. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2) filed by Core Communications, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 31 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME BY WHICH DEFENDANT ADZILLA, INC. MUST RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Adzilla, Inc [New Media]. (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 22, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo. Motion Hearing Continued for 7/31/2009 09:00 AM. Re 28 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Rescher, Owen) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Rescher, Owen) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL VISINET BROADBAND LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING HEARING. Plaintiff shall have until July 2, 2009 to respond to the motion. The hearing is continued to July 31, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 22, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 25 STIPULATION re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo and Proposed Order by Susan Simon. (Himmelfarb, Alan) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 21, 2009 Filing 23 STIPULATION THIRD STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME BY WHICH DEFENDANT CONDUCIVE CORPORATION MUST RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Conducive Corporation. (Rescher, Owen) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 6, 2009 Filing 22 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME BY WHICH DEFENDANT ADZILLA, INC. MUST RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Adzilla, Inc [New Media]. (Charlston, Gavin) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 21 CLERKS NOTICE - The Court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009) Modified on 4/29/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2009 09:00 AM. Re 20 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REGARDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL VISINET BROADBAND LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING HEARING. Plaintiff shall have until May 22, 2009 to respond to the motion to dismiss. The hearing on the motion shall be on June 12, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 27, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 24, 2009 Filing 19 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo by Susan Simon. (Himmelfarb, Alan) (Filed on 4/24/2009) Modified on 4/28/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2009 Filing 18 STIPULATION (second) for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Core Communications, Inc.. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 23, 2009 Filing 17 STIPULATION Second Stipulation Extending The Time By Which Defendant Conducive Corporation Must Respond To The Complaint by Conducive Corporation. (Rescher, Owen) (Filed on 4/23/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 16 Proposed Order re 14 MOTION to Relate Case CV-08-05113 TEH by Core Communications, Inc.. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 15 Declaration of Rocky N. Unruh in Support of 14 MOTION to Relate Case CV-08-05113 TEH filed byCore Communications, Inc.. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION to Relate Case CV-08-05113 TEH filed by Core Communications, Inc.. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 14, 2009 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Core Communications, Inc.. (Unruh, Rocky) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE to Plaintiff(s) Attorney(s) by e-mail or U.S. mail re: Failure to E-File/E-Mail re 1 Complaint and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. The Court also request for counsel to include in a separate pdf folder the Civil Cover Sheet for Attachment Purposes. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 11 Proposed Order re 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo, 10 Declaration in Support, [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 10 Declaration of Charles L. Watkins in Support of 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo filed byContinental Visinet Broadband, Inc. (Related document(s) 9 ) (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and supporting memo filed by Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 30, 2009 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Landmark Media Enterprises, LLC, Corporate Parent Continental Broadband Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Continental Broadband, LLC for Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc. (Addiego, Joseph) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 26, 2009 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending the Time by which Defendant Conducive Corporation Must Respond to the Complaint by Conducive Corporation. (Rescher, Owen) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
February 27, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Core Communications, Inc.. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Conducive Corporation. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adzilla, Inc [New Media]. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2009. Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2009 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/27/09. (Attachments: # 1 MMC Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 27, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR: 1. VIOLATION OF ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS PRIVACY ACT, 18 U.S.C. 2510; 2. VIOLATION OF COMPUTER FRAUD AND ABUSE ACT, 18 U.S.C. 1030; 3. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA'S CALIFORNIA INVASION OF PRIVACY ACT, CALIFORNIA PENAL CODE 630; 4. VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA'S COMPUTER CRIME LAW, PENAL CODE 502; 5. AIDING AND ABETTING; 6. CIVIL CONSPIRACY; 7. UNJUST ENRICHMENT: JURY DEMAND; against Adzilla, Inc [New Media], Conducive Corporation, Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc, Core Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 44611003231.). Filed bySusan Simon. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/27/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2009: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (aaa, Court Staff).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Adzilla, Inc [New Media] et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Simon
Represented By: Joseph H Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adzilla, Inc [New Media]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conducive Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Visinet Broadband, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Core Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?