Johnson et al v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Johnson, Estate of Oscar J. Grant III and Sophina Mesa
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District, Gary Gee, Johannes Mehserle, Anthony Pirone and Marysol Domenici
Case Number: 3:2009cv00901
Filed: March 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 609 FIRST AMENDEDORDER re 607 REDACTED VERSION OF AMENDED ORDER GRANTING RELEASE OF FUNDS FROM COURT BLOCKED ACCOUNT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/12/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
August 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 577 Request for Extension of Time to Order Trial Transcripts and to Move the Briefing Schedule (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2014)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER Denying Oscar Grant, Jr.'s Request for Transcript Payment Waiver. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
June 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER - Special Verdict Form as to Johntue Caldwell's Claims (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2014)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER DIRECTING COURT TO FURNISH DAILY LUNCH. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/27/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER Re Court's Proposed Final Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/25/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER Re Anthony Pirone's Availability (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 520 WRIT of Writ of Habeas Corpus and Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER Re Court's Second Proposed Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/10/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER Re Redactions to Exhibit 237 (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER re 492 REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT filed by Zephoia Smith. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER (1) Dismissing Johntue Caldwell's State Law Claims; (2) Dismissing Johntue Caldwell's Claim Against Defendant Pirone; and (3) Dismissing Oscar Grant Jr.'s Claim Against Defendant Gee. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/5/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER TO ALAMEDA DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE TO PRESENT EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/4/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER Re Court's Proposed Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 413 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and Denying 414 Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER, signed 5/30/14, GRANTING re 462 Letter filed by Marysol Domenici to excuse individual defendants Domenici and Mehserle from attending the 6/3/14 settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/30/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF INMATE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff Oscar Grant, Jr., is ordered to be made available by telephone for the settlement conference on 6/3/14 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/29/14. A copy of this order has been emailed to Mr. Cervantes, at CA State Prison.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Grant, Jr.'s Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2014. Defendants Gee and Pirone may file a response by 6/2/2014. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER Re Trial Continuance Request (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for an Extension of Time to File Proposed Jury Instructions (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER Re Deposition Travel Expenses Discovery Dispute (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 316 Motion for Substitution of Plaintiff; and Denying 319 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Caldwell's Claims. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL re (41 in 3:09-cv-04014-EMC) Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Oscar Julius Grant, Jr. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER DENYING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 309 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, filed by Oscar Julius Grant, Jr. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 285 286 Defendants Mehserle and Domenici's Motions for Partial Summary Judgment on Remand. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC TO 8/8/13 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC FROM 12/14/12 TO 4/18/13 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/12/12. Copies mailed to non-efilers.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 12/14/12 AT 10:30 A.M. Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC (pending appeal) Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/5/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS by Noon on Friday, June 24, 2011. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/23/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel RE CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS AT THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/24/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO ON DECEMBER 1, 2010 AND DECEMBER 2, 2010. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/16/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting pretrial dates; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/14/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 74 Amended Petition for Compromise Minor Claims (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 65 PETITION allowing documents to be filed under seal; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/3/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to settlement between plaintiff Sophina Mesa and defendant; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/8/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOC 64*** STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE; Each side to bear costs; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/8/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010) Modified on 2/11/2010 (awb, COURT STAFF).
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER EXCUSING ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Dfts Anthony Pirone and Marysol Domenci. Dfts shall be available by phone from 9:30 AM PST until further notice on 1/26/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/20/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re C-09-4835 CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/14/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re disclosure of confidential information; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/11/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST 13 for waiver of lead counsel at initial case management conference; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/19/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Bay Area Rapid Transit District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Johnson
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Oscar J. Grant III
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophina Mesa
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area Rapid Transit District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johannes Mehserle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Pirone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marysol Domenici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?