Petzschke v. Century Aluminum Company et al
Plaintiff: Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke and McClellan Cory
Defendant: John C. Fontaine, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Catherine Z. Manning, Jack E. Thompson, Peter C. Jone, Steve Schneider, Wayne R. Hale, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Jarl Berntzen, John P. O'Brien, Robert E. Fishman and Willy R. Strothotte
Petitioner: Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System
Undetermined: Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union No. 630 Pension-Annuity Trust Fund
Case Number: 3:2009cv01001
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2013 Filing 141 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #127 Notice of Appeal. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 29, 2013 Filing 140 MANDATE of USCA as to #127 Notice of Appeal: The judgment of this Court, entered January 02, 2013, takes effect this date.This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure.Costs are taxed against the appellant in the amount of $1941.90.(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER and Amended Opinion of USCA as to #127 Notice of Appeal. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER of USCA as to #127 Notice of Appeal. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2013)
January 2, 2013 Filing 137 Opinion of USCA as to #127 Notice of Appeal: Affirmed. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
June 20, 2011 Filing 136 Costs Taxed pursuant to stipulation in amount of $ 759.31 against plaintiffs. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 135 STIPULATION re #133 Bill of Costs, #134 Clerks Notice re Taxing of Costs of Century Aluminum Company by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Jacobi, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 134 CLERKS NOTICE to counsel re submitted Amended Bill of Costs (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 133 BILL OF COSTS (AMENDED) by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Jacobi, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 21, 2011 Filing 132 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form re #127 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 5/9/2011. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 16, 2011 Filing 130 BILL OF COSTS by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Jacobi, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 129 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form re #127 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 5/9/2011. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 131 USCA Case Number 11-15599 USCA for #127 Notice of Appeal, filed by Eric Petzschke, McClellan Cory, Peter Abrams, Stuart Wexler, Chris McNulty. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 11, 2011 Filing 128 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #127 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Notification Form)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2011: #2 docket sheet) (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE OF APPEAL 11-15599 as to #124 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, #125 Judgment by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. Filing fee $ 455, receipt #34611057377. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A & B, #2 Exh. C, representation statement)(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 126 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/3/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/6/2011. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 125 JUDGMENT : This action is dismissed in its entirety, and judgment in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS with prejudice. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 12/7/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
September 29, 2010 Filing 123 ADR Clerks Notice Updated ADR Phone Conference on 12/7/10 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that at the appointed time, all parties shall follow the call-in information provided. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 24, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 9/24/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 122 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing (Date Filed: 9/9/2010). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 121 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 17, 2010 Filing 120 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 119 Reply to Opposition REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CENTURY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byJarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 118 Reply to Opposition REPLY IN SUPPORT OF CENTURY DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byJarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 117 Reply Memorandum re #103 MOTION to Strike UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF UNDERWRITERS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE filed byCentury Aluminum Company, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 116 Memorandum in Opposition UNDERWRITERS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARATIONS filed byCentury Aluminum Company, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 115 Reply Memorandum re #104 MOTION to Dismiss UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCentury Aluminum Company, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler re #109 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, Disregard and Refuse to Notice the Declarations of Jill Ford, Ryan E. Fitzpatrick and Scott A. Gregory in Support of Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Thir, #113 Memorandum in Opposition, #110 Memorandum in Opposition, #111 Memorandum in Opposition, #112 Objection, Declaration of Service (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 113 Memorandum in Opposition Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Underwriters' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike filed byPeter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 112 OBJECTIONS to Objections to Century Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and Request to Strike Certain Portions of Memoranda in Support of Motions to Dismiss by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 111 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Underwriters' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byPeter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 110 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Century Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Dkt No. 99) (Securities and Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. 78 et seq.) filed byPeter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 30, 2010 Filing 109 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, Disregard and Refuse to Notice the Declarations of Jill Ford, Ryan E. Fitzpatrick and Scott A. Gregory in Support of Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Chris McNulty, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order in Support of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike, Disregard, and Refuse to Notice the Declarations of Jill Ford, Ryan E. Fitzpatrick and Scott A. Gregory in Support of Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof)(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 108 Request for Judicial Notice re #104 MOTION to Dismiss UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (PART 1), #2 Exhibit A (PART 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 107 Declaration of JILL FORD in Support of #104 MOTION to Dismiss UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Related document(s) #104 ) (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 106 Declaration of SCOTT A. GREGORY in Support of #104 MOTION to Dismiss UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #104 ) (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 105 Declaration of RYAN E. FITZPATRICK in Support of #104 MOTION to Dismiss UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (PART 1), #2 Exhibit A (PART 2))(Related document(s) #104 ) (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Varian, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 103 MOTION to Strike UNDERWRITERS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Varian, Robert) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 102 MOTION to Dismiss Century Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Doc. 99) filed by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 101 Second Supplemental Request For Judicial Notice in Support of #102 Century Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Complaint filed byJarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 66, #2 Exhibit 67 and 68)(Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 7/9/2010) Modified on 7/12/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting leave to file 3rd Amended Complaint and Revise Briefing Schedule (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 24, 2010 Filing 99 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to File Third Amended Complaint and Revise Briefing Schedule by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler, Chris McNulty. THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 98 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/23/10, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 3, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2010 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER continuing motions to dismiss and cmc to 9/3/10 at 9 a.m. and 3 p.m., respectively (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 96 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Set Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Defendants' Contemplated Motion(s) to Dismiss and to Re-Set Case Management Conference by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler re #94 Amended Complaint, Declaration of Service (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 94 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. 77 et seq., and The Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. 78 et seq. against McClellan Cory, Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams, Eric Petzschke. Filed byMcClellan Cory, Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams, Eric Petzschke. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting leave to file amended complaint . Second Amended Complaint is due 5/28/10. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 92 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to File Amended Complaint Responsive to the Court's April 27, 2010 Order by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
April 28, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2010 02:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 91 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 4/28/2010). (Court Reporter Yeomans.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND re #69 , #70 , #72 , #73 , #74 . Amended complaint is due 5/14/10. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 16, 2010 Filing 89 Statement CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS OF DEFENDANTS CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC AND MORGAN STANLEY & CO. INCORPORATED PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 AND CIVIL L.R. 3-16 by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Knaster, Stephen) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 88 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 12, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #64 MOTION to Strike AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #63 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #62 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants), #69 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants), #73 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, #72 MOTION to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2010 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER continuing motion to 4/23/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO 4/23/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 9, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2010 02:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 85 Reply Memorandum re #72 MOTION to Strike filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Knaster, Stephen) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 84 Reply Memorandum re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 6, 2010 Filing 83 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER POSTPONING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Jacobi, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
April 2, 2010 Filing 82 Reply Memorandum in Support of #70 Century Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byJarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/2/2010) Modified on 4/5/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2010 Filing 81 Reply Memorandum in Support of #69 Century Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byJarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/2/2010) Modified on 4/5/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2010 Filing 80 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler re #78 Memorandum in Opposition, #76 Memorandum in Opposition, #77 Memorandum in Opposition, #75 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Service (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 19, 2010 Filing 78 Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to #72 Underwriters' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike filed byPeter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Filing 77 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to #74 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and Request to Strike Certain Portions of Memoranda in Support of Motions to Dismiss filed byPeter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Filing 76 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to #73 the Century Defendants' and the Underwriter Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Securities and Exchange Act of 1933) filed byPeter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2010 Filing 75 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to #69 the Century Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Securities and Exchange Act of 1934) filed byPeter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 3/19/2010) Modified on 3/22/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2010 Filing 74 Request for Judicial Notice re #73 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof, #72 MOTION to Strike filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #73 , #72 ) (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 73 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declarationof Ryan E. Fitzpatrick, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Scott A. Gregory)(Varian, Robert) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 72 MOTION to Strike filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Varian, Robert) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 71 Proposed Order re #70 Request for Judicial Notice,, #69 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 70 Request for Judicial Notice re #69 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) Supplemental filed byJarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 64 and 65)(Related document(s) #69 ) (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) filed by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 1, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2010 02:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #62 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2010 09:00 AM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER (court signature page to Order #67 with new schedule) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER continuing motions (4/16/10) and case management (4/16/10); allowing the filing of an amended complaint (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 28, 2010 Filing 66 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to File Amended Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss by Peter Abrams, McClellan Cory, Eric Petzschke, Stuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 65 Request for Judicial Notice re #63 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF, #64 MOTION to Strike AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byCredit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #63 , #64 ) (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 64 MOTION to Strike AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Varian, Robert) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Varian, Robert) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Century Defendants) filed by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 61 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #62 Century Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byJarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Robert E. Fishman, John C. Fontaine, Wayne R. Hale, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Catherine Z. Manning, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-14, #2 Exhibit 15-35, #3 Exhibit 36-63)(Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Varian (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Knaster (Knaster, Stephen) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Lily Irene Becker (Becker, Lily) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RELATING CASE 09-4963. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by McClellan Cory, Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams, Eric Petzschke. Service waived by Robert E. Fishman waiver sent on 11/19/2009, answer due 1/19/2010. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by McClellan Cory, Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams, Eric Petzschke. Service waived by Catherine Z. Manning waiver sent on 11/19/2009, answer due 1/19/2010. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by McClellan Cory, Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams, Eric Petzschke. Service waived by Wayne R. Hale waiver sent on 11/19/2009, answer due 1/19/2010. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
November 23, 2009 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Relate Case 09-4963-JW filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union No. 630 Pension-Annuity Trust Fund. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion)(Goodman, Benny) (Filed on 11/23/2009) Modified on 11/24/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2009 Filing 52 Summons on Consolidated Complaint Issued as to Robert E. Fishman, Wayne R. Hale, Catherine Z. Manning. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 51 COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint for Violation of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. 77 et seq., and the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. 78 et seq. against Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, John C. Fontaine, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson (Filing fee $ 350.). Filed byStuart Wexler, Eric Petzschke, McClellan Cory, Peter Abrams. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 13, 2009 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/13/09 at 11:00 a.m. has been taken off calendar and will be rescheduled. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING STUART WEXLER'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS SOLE LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVING SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 21, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2010 03:00 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 49 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2009 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/21/2009). Case continued to 3/5/10 @ 3:00 p.m.. for Further Case Management ConferenceCase continued to 3/5/10 @ 9:00 a.m. for Motion to Dismiss(Motion due 1/15/10, Opposition 2/5/10, Reply 2/19/10 ) () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 48 Declaration of Stuart Wexler Declaration of Lead Plaintiff Stuart Wexler Requesting Appointment as Sole Lead Plaintiff in the Consolidated Action filed byStuart Wexler. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 9, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2009 02:30 PM. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 9, 2009 Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, RULE 26(f) REPORT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Jarl Berntzen, Michael A. Bless, Century Aluminum Company, John C. Fontaine, Peter C. Jone, Logan W. Kruger, John P. O'Brien, Steve Schneider, Willy R. Strothotte, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO 9/18/09 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE CASES; RE: MOTIONS TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND APPROVE SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL re #15 , #19 , #27 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 2, 2009 Filing 44 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated. (Varian, Robert) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
June 26, 2009 Filing 43 Brief re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Supplemental Memorandum filed byWaterford Township General Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Seefer, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 25, 2009 Filing 42 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 19, 2009, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 24, 2009 Filing 41 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/19/2009 before Illston (Date Filed: 6/24/2009). (Court Reporter B. Ball.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 40 Reply Memorandum re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byWaterford Township General Employees Retirement System. (Seefer, Christopher) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 39 Reply Memorandum DEFENDANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED ACTIONS filed byPeter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Abrams re #35 Reply Memorandum,, #36 Declaration in Opposition,, #37 Declaration in Opposition,, Declaration of Service (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Peter Abrams Declaration of [Proposed] Lead Plaintiff Peter Abrams in: 1) Opposition to Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel; 2) Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Related Actions; and 3) Further Support of Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel filed byPeter Abrams. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Stuart Wexler Declaration of [Proposed] Lead Plaintiff Stuart Wexler in: 1) Opposition to Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel; 2) Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Related Actions; and 3) Further Support of Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel filed byPeter Abrams. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 35 Reply Memorandum Proposed Lead Plaintiffs Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams and Marc Panasuk's Reply in: 1) Opposition to Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel; 2) Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Related Actions; and 3) Further Support of Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel filed byPeter Abrams. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byWaterford Township General Employees Retirement System. (Seefer, Christopher) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 33 Statement of Non-Opposition CENTURY DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE CASES AND TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFFS AND LEAD PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL [Dkt. 15-21] filed byPeter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 32 Memorandum in Opposition Proposed Lead Plaintiffs Stuart Wexler, Peter Abrams and Marc Panasuk's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in: 1) Opposition to Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel; 2) Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate Related Actions; and 3) Further Support of Proposed Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiffs' Selection of Counsel filed byPeter Abrams. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting request for extension; Case Management Conference set for 9/11/2009 02:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/19/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 19, 2009 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson re #29 Stipulation, and Proposed Order Regarding Extension of Time To Plead and Request to Continue Case Management Conference (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 29 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD AND REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Peter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson re #27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 15, 2009 Filing 27 MOTION to Consolidate Cases DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES filed by Peter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 12, 2009 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #18 Certificate of Service,, #17 Declaration in Support,, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation of Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Cou, #16 Brief,, #24 Certificate of Counsel,, #25 Certificate of Counsel,, Certification by Lawyer Seeking to Serve as Class Counsel [Local Rule 3-7(d)] by Francis M. Gregorek on behalf of Peter Abrams (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Gregorek, Francis) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #18 Certificate of Service,, #17 Declaration in Support,, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation of Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Cou, #16 Brief,, #24 Certificate of Counsel,, Certification by Lawyer Seeking to Serve as Class Counsel [Local Rule 3-7(d)] by Rachele R. Rickert on behalf of Peter Abrams (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #18 Certificate of Service,, #17 Declaration in Support,, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation of Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Cou, #16 Brief,, Certification by Lawyer Seeking to Serve as Class Counsel [Local Rule 3-7(d)] by Betsy Carol Manifold on behalf of Peter Abrams (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) (Seefer, Christopher) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) (Robbins, Darren) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) (Peterson, Erik) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 20 Declaration of Erik D. Peterson in Support of #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byWaterford Township General Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #19 ) (Peterson, Erik) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ;Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peterson, Erik) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Abrams re #17 Declaration in Support,, #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation of Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Cou, #16 Brief,, Declaration of Service (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 17 Declaration of Rachele R. Rickert in Support of #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation of Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Cou, #16 Brief,, filed byPeter Abrams. (Related document(s) #15 , #16 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 16 Brief re #15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation of Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Cou Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Consolidation of Cases, Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Counsel filed byPeter Abrams. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 8, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Motion and Motion for Consolidation of Cases, MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion for Appointment of Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and Approval of Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Counsel filed by Peter Abrams. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Consolidating Cases, Appointing Stuart Wexler, Mark Panasuk, and Peter Abrams as Lead Plaintiffs Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 And Approving Lead Plaintiffs' Choice of Counsel)(Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
April 15, 2009 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2009 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009)
April 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASE to 09-1103, 09-1162, 09-1205. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/8/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2009) Modified on 4/16/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2009 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson re #11 Response in Support, #10 Certificate of Interested Entities, (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 3, 2009 Filing 11 Response of Defendants to #6 Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 filed byPeter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson. (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/3/2009) Modified on 4/6/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2009 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Peter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civil L.R. 3-12 (Ericson, Bruce) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
April 1, 2009 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Abrams re #6 MOTION to Relate Case Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12, #7 Declaration in Support, #8 Proposed Order Declaration of Service (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Filing 8 Proposed Order re #6 MOTION to Relate Case Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 by Peter Abrams. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Filing 7 Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of #6 MOTION to Relate Case Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 filed byPeter Abrams. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
April 1, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION to Relate Case Motion for Administrative Relief to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 09-1103-PJH filed by Peter Abrams. (Manifold, Betsy) (Filed on 4/1/2009) Modified on 4/2/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2009 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File documents #1 and #2 by plaintiff's counsel. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Peter C. Jone, John P. O'Brien, Willy R. Strothotte, Jarl Berntzen, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated, Century Aluminum Company, Logan W. Kruger, Michael A. Bless, Steve Schneider, John C. Fontaine, Jack E. Thompson. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2009. Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2009 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 standing orders and cmc order)(ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 9, 2009 Filing 2 Certification of Attorney Lionel Glancy pursuant to Northern District Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by Eric Petzschke. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009) (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued); against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611029737.). Filed byEric Petzschke. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2009: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petzschke v. Century Aluminum Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Fontaine
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Represented By: Stephen Michael Knaster
Represented By: Lily Irene Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Z. Manning
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack E. Thompson
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter C. Jone
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Schneider
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne R. Hale
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Represented By: Stephen Michael Knaster
Represented By: Lily Irene Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Bless
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Aluminum Company
Represented By: Robert P. Varian
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logan W. Kruger
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarl Berntzen
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P. O'Brien
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Fishman
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willy R. Strothotte
Represented By: Bruce A. Ericson
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Wexler
Represented By: Francis M. Gregorek
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Rachele R. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Abrams
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris McNulty
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Petzschke
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McClellan Cory
Represented By: Betsy Carol Manifold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Plumbers and Pipefitters Local Union No. 630 Pension-Annuity Trust Fund
Represented By: Benny Copeline Goodman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Waterford Township General Employees Retirement System
Represented By: Erik David Peterson
Represented By: Christopher Paul Seefer
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?