Bender v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.

Plaintiff: Gregory Bender
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01149
Filed: March 16, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. By stipulation of the parties, all claims asserted in this action by plaintiff and counter-defendant Gregory Bender against defendant and counter-claimant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. and all claims asserted by defendant and counter-claimant Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., against plaintiff and counter-defendant Gregory Bender are dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/14/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
September 16, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: STIPULATED MOTION TO RESCHEDULE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties' stipulation to continue the Case Management Conference to December 17, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 25, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER VACATING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. The parties' stipulation to continue the case management conference from August 27, 2010 to September 24, 2010 is granted. No further continuances will be granted absent a timely filing and additional showing as to good cause. In light of the above, the September 20, 2010 claim construction hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 25, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 14, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The Status Conference scheduled for July 16, 2010 is continued to August 27, 2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 14, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 23, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 MOTION to Strike Notice of Renewed Motion and Renewed Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., 65 Stipulation filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Motion reset from 6/23/10 at 3:00 p.m. to 8/25/10 at 10:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/23/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
February 1, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 26 Defendant's Motion to Strike; and Granting Defendant's Motion to Compel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
December 17, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 Stipulation filed by Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/17/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 4, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
October 23, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
August 6, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to October 23, 2009. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bender
Represented By: David Noel Kuhn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?