January 2, 2013 |
Filing
315
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. Federal Signal Corporation and Labrie Environmental Group are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2013. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
|
November 16, 2012 |
Filing
309
ORDER GRANTING FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SUBMISSION OF REPLY MEMORANDUM RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 58(d). The reply memorandum is due no later than December 19, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 16, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
|
October 30, 2012 |
Filing
304
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE ALL DEADLINES REGARDING DEFENDANT VOLVO TRUCKS NORTH AMERICA, INC.'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT. All deadlines related to the motion are continued for 45 days. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 30, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing
302
ORDER RE: DEFENDANT VOLVO'S MOTION FOR STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition no later than October 30, 2012. Volvo shall file its reply, if any, no later than November 2, 2012. Unless otherwise ordered, the matter will stand submitted on November 2, 2012, or the date on which Volvo files its reply, whichever is earlier. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 25, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
|
October 24, 2012 |
Filing
301
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 298 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam Judgment Debtor Exam set for 11/26/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
|
October 22, 2012 |
Filing
300
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SUBMISSION OF REPLY MEMORANDUM RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 58(D). The reply memorandum to the request for entry of second amended judgment, if any, is due November 19, 2012 if final settlement is not reached. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
|
October 2, 2012 |
Filing
280
ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT. (1) No later than October 12, 2012, plaintiff shall file any opposition to the motion. (2) No later than October 19, 2012, Federal Signal Corporation and Labrie Environmental Groups shall file any reply. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the matter will stand submitted on October 19, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing
278
AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Raymond P. Mariolle, Regina Lynn Mariolle against Amsted Industires Incorporated, Amsted Industries, Inc., Consolidated Metco, Inc., Volvo Group North America Inc., Volvo Group North America, Inc., Wittke Wa ste Equipment. Plaintiffs Raymond P. Mariolle and Regina Mariolle shall have judgment against defendants Volvo Trucks North America, Inc.; Consolidated Metco, Inc.; Amsted Industries, Inc.; and Wittke Waste Equipment in the amounts set forth in the Special Verdict Form filed on May 21, 2012. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/4/2012 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 20, 2012 |
Filing
261
ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE FOR WITTKE'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL OR REMITTITUR AND RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW. The Court sets July 27, 2012 as the hearing date for Wittke's motions. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2012. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
|
May 21, 2012 |
Filing
252
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiffs Raymond P. Mariolle and Regina Mariolle shall have judgment against defendants Volvo Trucks North America, Inc.; Consolidated Metco, Inc.; and Wittke Waste Equipment in the amounts set forth in the Special Verdict Form filed on May 21, 2012. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
244
ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 17, 2012. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
|
March 28, 2012 |
Filing
112
DISCOVERY ORDER re 111 Letter filed by Raymond P. Mariolle. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/28/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
|
November 18, 2011 |
Filing
109
ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Non-expert discovery cutoff: December 9, 2011. Designation of Experts: December 30, 2011. Expert discovery cutoff: February 3, 2011. Dispositive motions: February 17, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
104
ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/9/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
|
October 31, 2011 |
Filing
102
ORDER re 101 Stipulation filed by slade neighbors Discovery Hearing set for 11/9/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 10/31/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
|
October 20, 2011 |
Filing
99
ORDER Discovery meet and confer set for 10/31/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/20/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
|
March 30, 2011 |
Filing
86
ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO LODGE CHAMBERS COPY IN COMPLIANCE WITH GENERAL ORDER 45 AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Defendant Volvo is directed to submit a chambers copy of its March 21, 2011 answer. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/30/2011. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
|
March 3, 2011 |
Filing
80
CONDITIONAL ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Conditionally granting 78 Motion For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; plaintiff is required to E-FILE the Second Amended Complaint by March 7, and serve the Second Amended Complaint by April 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/3/2011 (mmclc2, COURT STAFF).
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing
72
ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR WITTKE WASTE EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/17/2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing
70
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND AMENDING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Pursuant to stipulation, trial is now set for July 25, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/10/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing
66
ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF DISCOVERY CUTOFFS, DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS, AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/20/10. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
|
September 10, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR LABRIE ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
|
June 14, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINTS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH FEDERAL RULES. The amended complaints are STRICKEN, and plaintiffs are directed to file, respectively and no later than June 16, 2010, a First Amended Complaint and Second Amended Complaint complying with Fed. R. Civ. P. 10(a). Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 14, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
|
May 20, 2010 |
Filing
48
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint no later than May 21, 2010 and serve it on the newly-named defendants no later than June 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing
46
ORDER STRIKING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DOE 1 AMENDMENT AND DOE 2 AMENDMENT FILED IN CIVIL CASE NO. 09-1209. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
|
May 11, 2010 |
Filing
43
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND AMENDING PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Non-expert discovery cutoff 11/19/2010. Designation of experts 12/10/2010; rebuttal 12/28/2010. Expert discovery cutoff 1/14/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2011. Pretrial Co nference set for 4/19/2011 3:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 5/2/2011 9:00 AM. Status Conference set for 2/4/2011 10:30 AM, joint statement due by 1/28/2011. The parties' joint request for an order affording plaintiffs leave to amend is granted, conditioned on plaintiffs' filing their respective amended complaints no later than May 21, 2010 and serving Labrie no later than June 18, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 11, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
|
April 6, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER re (36 in 3:09-cv-04250-MMC) Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/6/10. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
|
April 2, 2010 |
Filing
37
ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 04/02/10. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
|
October 13, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties shall participate in private mediation within 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 13, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
|
October 9, 2009 |
Filing
32
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/9/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing
24
ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JAMES PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE INTERROGATORIES IN EXCESS OF TWENTY-FIVE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
|
August 19, 2009 |
Filing
20
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to October 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
|