Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industries Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund et al v. Simi Management Corp.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industries Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund and Jim Beno
Defendant: Simi Management Corp.
Mediator: Michael Sobel
Case Number: 3:2009cv01332
Filed: March 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
May 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 7/16/2010 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/11/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING re 25 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industries Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund, Jim Beno to continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 5/14/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/13/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industries Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund et al v. Simi Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Automotive Industries Welfare Fund, Automotive Industries Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Beno
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simi Management Corp.
Represented By: Douglas Anton Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Michael Sobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?