Minor et al v. FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Minor and Banipal Shabaz
Defendant: FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc., FedEx Kinko's International, Inc., Federal Express Corporation and FedEx Kinko's, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01375
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part re 116 Motion for Attorneys' Fees; granting re 121 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. (tehlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/1/2013 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2013. Fairness Hearing set for 7/15/2013 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/26/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re supplemental briefing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/19/2013. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Modify Class Action Settlement Preliminary Approval Order. Fairness Hearing reset for 7/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Susan Illston for Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/25/2013. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 93 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER setting forth questions for preliminary approval hearing. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 94 Defendants' motion for a status conference, vacating the preliminary approval hearing, and ordering that the parties file a joint supplemental brief on or before October 24, 2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. No Further Continuances shall be granted. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/22/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS' TO FILE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/02/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SET DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS FILING FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/16/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/24/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/13/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Further Case Management Conference to 12/19/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/08/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 64 Motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file second amended complaint by 11/29/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER naming the law offices of Peter M. Hart as lead counsel. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/13/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by MDL Panel Deeming as MOOT the Motion to Transfer Action Under 28 USC Sec. 1407. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER allowing defendant to appear by phone at the 08/16/10 case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/11/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 45 Motion for leave to file first amended complaint. Amended complaint to be filed on or before 08/13/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference set to 1/11/2010 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/24/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 11/30/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 15 Motion to Stay. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/15/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER voluntarily dismissing certain defendants. Federal Express Corporation; FedEx Kinko's International, Inc. and FedEx Kinko's, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/02/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor et al v. FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Minor
Represented By: Kenneth H Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banipal Shabaz
Represented By: Kenneth H Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Office & Print Services, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Kinko's International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Kinko's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?