Kroll v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Cinda Kroll
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Interested Party: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv01404
Filed: March 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2011 Filing 135 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Cinda Kroll Against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/26/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 133 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #132 Ex Parte Application Administrative Motion to Clairfy Status of Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Declaration of Laurence F. Padway re Administrative Motion filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #132 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 25, 2011 Filing 132 Ex Parte Application Administrative Motion to Clairfy Status of Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge filed by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 131 OBJECTIONS to re #129 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed by Cinda Kroll, #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' FeeREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed by Cinda Kroll, #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' FeeREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed by Cinda Kroll, #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' Fee by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 130 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rebecca A. Hull (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 25, 2011 Filing 129 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed by Cinda Kroll, #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs filed by Cinda Kroll, #115 MOTION REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS, AND TO STRIKE TAXATION OF COSTS re #101 Costs Taxed MOTION REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS, AND TO STRIKE TAXATION OF COSTS re #101 Costs Taxed filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Objections due by 9/8/2011. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/25/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #125 Motion to Relate Case to C-11-3863.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
August 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 FULL DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED - PLEASE DISREGARD AND SEE DOCUMENT NO. 128 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #125 Motion to Relate Case (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2011) Modified on 8/23/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2011 Filing 126 Minute Entry: Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing held on 8/11/2011 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 8/11/2011). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/11/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 125 MOTION to Relate Case and [Proposed] Order filed by Cinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER RE HEARING. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/3/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 123 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #122 Reply to Opposition/Response Reply Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Letter 1/5/2010, #2 Exhibit 2. Order 6/22/2010, #3 Exhibit 3. Order 9/21/2010, #4 Exhibit 4. Abstract of Judgment)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Filing 122 REPLY (re #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees ) Reply in Support of Motion for Attorneys Fees filed byCinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 121 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE setting Motion hearing for August 11, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 29, 2011 Filing 120 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Motion Hearing for 8/11/2011 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 24, 2011 Filing 119 RESPONSE (re #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER REFERRING Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Plaintiff's Motion for Late Filing, and Defendnat's Motion for Review of the Clerk's Taxation of Costs, to a randomly assigned Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/10/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 116 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #114 Declaration in Support,, #99 Declaration in Support, #113 Declaration in Support, Reply Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of Administrative Motion for Late Filing filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #114 , #99 , #113 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 115 MOTION REVIEW OF CLERKS TAXATION OF COSTS, AND TO STRIKE TAXATION OF COSTS re #101 Costs Taxed filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 114 Declaration of Michelle Y. Magsaysay in Support of #112 Opposition/Response to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Michelle Y. Magsaysay In Support Of Defendant's And Real Party In Interest's Opposition To Plaintiff's Administrative Motion For Late Fling Of Motion For Attorney's Fees And Bill of Costs filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #112 ) (Magsaysay, Michelle) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 113 Declaration of Michelle Y. Magsaysay in Support of #112 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Magsaysay, Michelle) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 112 RESPONSE (re #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs ) filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Magsaysay, Michelle) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 117 ABSTRACT of Judgement Issued (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REGARDING BILL OF COSTS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 110 Declaration of Richard Pearl in Support of #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees CORRECTION OF DOCKET #106 . filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resume, #2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Rates, #3 Exhibit Westlaw Bill Report)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 109 Declaration of Jill Holmquist in Support of #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #103 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 108 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #109 . *** Declaration of Jill Holmquist in Support of #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #103 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/2/2011) Modified on 6/2/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2011 Filing 107 Request for Judicial Notice re #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Korblum Dec, #2 Exhibit Horner Dec, #3 Exhibit Kantor Dec, #4 Exhibit White Dec)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 106 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #110 . *** Declaration of Richard Pearl in Support of #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resume, #2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Rates, #3 Exhibit Westlaw Bill Report)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/1/2011) Modified on 6/2/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2011 Filing 105 Declaration of Felicia Phillips filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Time Records)(Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 104 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #103 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 103 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Attorneys Fees filed by Cinda Kroll. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 102 OBJECTIONS to re #97 Bill of Costs, #101 Costs Taxed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
June 1, 2011 Filing 101 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 460.00 against defendants. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 100 Proposed Order re #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs [Proposed] Order for Late Filing by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 99 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs Declaration of Laurence F. Padway In Support of Administrative Motion filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #98 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Administrative Motion for Late Filing of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs filed by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 31, 2011 Filing 97 BILL OF COSTS by Cinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dec. L. Padway with proof of payments)(Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the Order Regarding Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment entered on 3/31/2011, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants in the amount of $43,621.87 plus $330 in prejudgment interest. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/13/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE DISPUTED ISSUES raised in Joint Letter #92 ; REMANDING to Plan Administrator. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/13/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 94 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #92 Letter filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Email 4/4/2011, #2 Exhibit 2. Letter 4/12/2011, #3 Exhibit 3. Emails 4/21/2011)(Related document(s) #92 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 93 Declaration of Cinda Kroll in Support of #92 Letter filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #92 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 92 Letter from Joint Letter from Counsel Re: Benefits. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #47 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #53 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #86 Ex Parte Application (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 90 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Notice of Change of Firm Name (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 89 Memorandum in Opposition re #86 Ex Parte Application Plaintiff Cinda Krolls Administrative Motion to File Supplement Brief re Cross- Motions for Summary Judgment or Alternative Request for Judicial Notice filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 88 Request for Judicial Notice re #87 Request for Judicial Notice,, PART 2 CONTAINING DECLARATION OF JOANNE CARROLL AND EXHIBITS filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 79-Declaration of Joanne Carroll, #2 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3) to Carroll Dec., #3 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), #4 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M - Part 1, #17 Exhibit M - Part 2-1, #18 Exhibit M - Part 2-2, #19 Exhibit M - Part 2-3, #20 Exhibit M - Part 3, #21 Exhibit M - Part 4, #22 Exhibit M - Part 5, #23 Exhibit M - Part 6, #24 Exhibit M - Part 7, #25 Exhibit M - Part 8, #26 Exhibit M - Part 9, #27 Exhibit M - Part 10, #28 Exhibit M - Part 11, #29 Exhibit M - Part 12, #30 Exhibit M - Part 12, #31 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #87 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 87 Request for Judicial Notice re #86 Ex Parte Application Plaintiff Cinda Krolls Administrative Motion to File Supplement Brief re Cross- Motions for Summary Judgment or Alternative Request for Judicial Notice filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Doc. 76-Minutes, #2 Doc. 77-Letter from L. Padway, #3 Doc. 78-Supplemental Brief Regarding Plan Documents filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #4 Doc. 80-Plaintiffs Reply to Supplemental Brief re Standard of Review, #5 Doc. 81-Dec. of L. Padway)(Related document(s) #86 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 26, 2011 Filing 86 Ex Parte Application Plaintiff Cinda Krolls Administrative Motion to File Supplement Brief re Cross- Motions for Summary Judgment or Alternative Request for Judicial Notice filed by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 14, 2011 Filing 84 Declaration of Joanne Carroll in Support of #82 Reply to Opposition, Supplemental filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #82 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 17, 2010 Filing 83 Declaration of Joanne Carroll in Support of #82 Reply to Opposition, filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Part 1 of 6, #4 Exhibit C Part 2 of 6, #5 Exhibit C Part 3 of 6, #6 Exhibit C Part 4 of 6, #7 Exhibit C Part 5 of 6, #8 Exhibit C Part 6 of 6)(Related document(s) #82 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 17, 2010 Filing 82 Reply to Opposition re #53 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Revised Reply Brief filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 4, 2010 Filing 81 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #80 Reply Memorandum, Declaration of Laurence F. Padway filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reports of Dr. Sloan)(Related document(s) #80 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 12/4/2010)
December 3, 2010 Filing 80 Reply Memorandum re #53 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Cinda Kroll's Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Cinda Kroll's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross-Motion filed byCinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER 1) REQUIRING REVISED REPLY BRIEFS AND 2) SETTING HEARING ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
September 27, 2010 Filing 78 RESPONSE to re #77 Order Declaration of Laura Sullivan in Response to September 21, 2010 Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying #63 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 76 Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull in Support of #69 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull in Response to Court's Request for Information regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt #63 filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #69 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Filing 75 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 9/8/2010) re #63 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Contempt Regarding Real Party's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to F. R. C. P. Rule 37(b)(2). Parties to submit further briefing. Court will take matter under submission and will issue order thereafter. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY re #72 Stipulation filed by Cinda Kroll, #71 Stipulation filed by Cinda Kroll. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/25/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 73 Reply Memorandum Reply re #63 Motion for Contempt filed byCinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 8/26/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 Filing 72 STIPULATION re #71 Stipulation to extend time for plaintiff's reply by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 71 STIPULATION to extend time for plaintiff's reply by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 70 Declaration in Support of #69 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull in Support of Defendant's and Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #69 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 69 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt #63 filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #67 Stipulation filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #63 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Contempt Regarding Real Party's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to F. R. C. P. Rule 37(b)(2)(A) MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Contempt Regarding Real Party's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to F. R. C. P. Rule 37(b)(2)(A) filed by Cinda Kroll. Motion reset for 9/8/10 at 3:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/13/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 67 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order To Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion For Contempt by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffery S. White on 7/13/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing (Docket #63) reset for 9/8/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 65 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 64 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #63 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Contempt Regarding Real Party's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to F. R. C. P. Rule 37(b)(2)(A) MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Contempt Regarding Real Party's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to F. R. C. P. Rule 37(b)(2)(A) filed byCinda Kroll. (Related document(s) #63 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Contempt Regarding Real Party's Failure to Comply With a Court Order Pursuant to F. R. C. P. Rule 37(b)(2)(A) filed by Cinda Kroll. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2010 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kruk v. Metlife Order)(Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/22/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 61 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company re #25 Order, #50 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Discovery,, Notice to Court re Compliance with Discovery Order Nos. 25 and 50 (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 60 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/24/10, before Judge EDWARD M. CHEN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/7/2010. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 59 Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull in Support of #58 Reply Memorandum, filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #58 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 28, 2010 Filing 58 Reply Memorandum re #53 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 57 Declaration of Laurence F. padway in Support of #56 Reply Memorandum, filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ex. 1 - Emails)(Related document(s) #56 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 56 Reply Memorandum re #53 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Cinda Kroll's Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Cinda Kroll's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross-Motion filed byCinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #54 Stipulation Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/19/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 54 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule for Dispositive Motions by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 15, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated: pursuant to #33 Order GRANTING #32 Stipulation SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 53 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 52 Declaration of Laura Sullivan in Support of #51 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Re Administrative Record filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #51 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 Filing 51 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Filing Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1 of 13, #2 Exhibit Part 2 of 13, #3 Exhibit Part 3 of 13, #4 Exhibit Part 4 of 13, #5 Exhibit Part 5 of 13, #6 Exhibit Part 6 of 13, #7 Exhibit Part 7 of 13, #8 Exhibit Part 8 of 13, #9 Exhibit Part 9 of 13, #10 Exhibit Part 10 of 13, #11 Exhibit Part 11 of 13, #12 Exhibit Part 12 of 13, #13 Exhibit Part 13 of 13)(Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Eenying in Part #36 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to Written Discovery; and Denying #38 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Depositions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 24, 2010 Filing 49 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/24/2010 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 3/24/2010) re #36 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and the Production of Documents filed by Cinda Kroll, #38 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Depositions filed by Cinda Kroll. Court took motions under submission and will issue order. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/24/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 48 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Cinda Kroll's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Authoritative Article)(Related document(s) #47 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Cinda Kroll's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cinda Kroll. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 09:00 AM. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 46 OBJECTIONS to re #43 Reply to Opposition, Objections to Evidence by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 45 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rebecca A. Hull (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 44 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #43 Reply to Opposition, Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of Reply re Motions to Compel filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Martket Study)(Related document(s) #43 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 43 Reply to Opposition re #36 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and the Production of Documents, #38 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Depositions Reply in Support of Motions to Compel filed byCinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 3, 2010 Filing 42 Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull in Support of #41 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #41 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 Filing 41 Memorandum in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and the Production of Documents, #38 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Depositions filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 40 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing (#36 and 38) reset for 3/24/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom D, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 39 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #38 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Depositions Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of Motion to Compel Attendance at Deposition filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit Objections, #3 Exhibit Objections)(Related document(s) #38 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 38 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Depositions filed by Cinda Kroll. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2010 10:30 AM. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 37 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #36 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and the Production of Documents filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Laurence F. Padway to Rebecca Hull, #2 Exhibit Email from Rebecca Hull, #3 Exhibit Email to Rebecca Hull, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Answers to Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Defendants Response to Request for Production of Documents)(Related document(s) #36 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and the Production of Documents filed by Cinda Kroll. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2010 10:30 AM. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 3, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Cross Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #34 Stipulation CHANGING HEARING DATE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 1, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2010 01:30 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 Stipulation SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/1/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 32 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing the Further Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2010 01:30 PM. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 4, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Stipulation Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule For Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 31, 2009 Filing 29 STIPULATION and [proposed] Order Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule For Dispositive Motions by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 JOINT REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 27 STIPULATION JOINT REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #17 Plaintiff's Motion to Augment Administrative Record and for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 22, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 24 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 10/9/09, case not settled, no follow up contemplated, mediation complete. Signed by Mediator, Paul J. Dubow, dated 10/12/09. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 23 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TOAUGMENT THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT DISCOVERY filed byCinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 22 Declaration of Laura Sullivan in Support of #21 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #21 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Directing Defendant to Augment the Administrative Record and for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #16 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 19 Proposed Order re #17 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Order Directing Defendants to Augment Administrative Record and for Leave to Conduct Discovery by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 18 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #17 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Order Directing Defendants to Augment Administrative Record and for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed byCinda Kroll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Proposed Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit Report of Dr. Dughman, #4 Exhibit Metlifes letter of June 18, 2008)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION for Discovery Motion for Order Directing Defendants to Augment Administrative Record and for Leave to Conduct Discovery filed by Cinda Kroll. Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2009 09:00 AM. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 8, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Motion Directing Defendants to Augment Administrative Record and for Leave to Conduct Discovery and (Proposed) Order filed by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 2, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 10/9/2009 01:00 PM., at the U.S. District Court, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, 16th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94102. Report to ADR Reception Room 6892 on the 16th floor to be directed to the assigned courtroom. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 3, 2009 Filing 15 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Paul J. Dubow as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 21, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2010 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 Filing 14 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/17/2009 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 7/21/2009). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/21/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cinda Kroll. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 11, 2009 Filing 12 Letter from Laurence F. Padway. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 7/11/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 11 Declaration of Cari A. Cohorn in Support of #10 Case Management Statement filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 7 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
April 30, 2009 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Respond by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 22, 2009 Filing and Returned Check Fee: $ 395.00, receipt number 34611031350. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 17, 2009 Filing 5 First Notice of Payment Due in the amount of $395.00 (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2009 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2009. Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2009 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611003387.). Filed byCinda Kroll. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2009: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (hdj, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kroll v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinda Kroll
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle Yumi Magsaysay
Represented By: Cari Ann Cohorn
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Michelle Yumi Magsaysay
Represented By: Cari Ann Cohorn
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?