Guice et al v. D&R Construction, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Guice and Patricia Rose
Defendant: D&R Construction, Inc and Damian Neveaux
Case Number: 3:2009cv01464
Filed: April 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Kenneth Guice, Patricia Rose against D&R Construction, Inc, Damian Neveaux (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. The January 22, 2010 hearing is vacated. To the extent plaintiffs seek an award of compensatory damages and an award of costs, the motions are granted. To the extent plaintiffs seek an award of prejudgment interest and an award of attorney's fees, the motions are denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 14, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS SECOND OPPORTUNITY TO SUPPLEMENT MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; CONTINUING HEARING TO JANUARY 22, 2010. Plaintiffs are afforded leave to file, no later than January 8, 2010, a supplemental memorandum and any supplemental declarations. The hearing on plaintiffs' motions is continued from December 11, 2009 to January 22, 2010, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 7, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 20, 2009 to February 5, 2010. A Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 13, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS OPPORTUNITY TO SUPPLEMENT MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; CONTINUING HEARING TO DECEMBER 11, 2009. Plaintiffs are afforded leave to file, no later than November 20, 2009, declarations containing admissible statements of fact, as well as any supporting exhibits, to prove the amount of damages to which each plaintiff is entitled. The hearing on plaintiffs motions is continued from November 6, 2009 to December 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 18, 2009 to November 20, 2009; a Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than November 13, 2009. Plaintiffs ar e directed to file, no later than October 2, 2009, either a request for entry of default as to each defendant or a statement indicating why plaintiffs should not be required to do so. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 16, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT NEVEAUX'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS; DIRECTIONS TO DEFENDANT NEVEAUX. No later than August 21, 2009, Neveaux shall file a response to the comp laint. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 17, 2009 to September 18, 2009; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 11, 2009. Plaintiffs are directed to serve a copy of this order on Neveaux and to fi le proof of such service no later than July 16, 2009. Neveaux is directed to provide the Court with an address at which he may be served with documents in this case, and to do so no later than 14 days from the date on which plaintiffs serve him with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 14, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guice et al v. D&R Construction, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Guice
Represented By: Wayne Jerome Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rose
Represented By: Wayne Jerome Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&R Construction, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Neveaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?