Dudek v. Law Office of Scott Carruthers
Plaintiff: Rae Dudek
Defendant: Law Office of Scott Carruthers
Case Number: 3:2009cv01591
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 37 Stipulation filed by Rae Dudek. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/29/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $4,000.00 (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 27 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER resetting cmc from 10/21/09 to 12/16/09 25 Notice (Other) filed by Rae Dudek. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Setting Case Management Conference set for 8/26/2009 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009) Modified on 8/5/2009 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudek v. Law Office of Scott Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rae Dudek
Represented By: George Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Scott Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?