California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Lake County et al
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Defendant: Lake County, Lake County Department of Public Services, Kim Kevin Clymire and Chuck Maves
Case Number: 3:2009cv01756
Filed: April 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER vacating 3/5/10 case management; setting 6/10 as filing deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting request to appear by phone re 30 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance v. Lake County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Department of Public Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Kevin Clymire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Maves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?