Encompass Holdings Inc. v. Daly et al
Plaintiff: Encompass Holdings Inc. and Daren Brinkman
Defendant: Carey F. Daly, II and Randall J. Lanham
Consol_defendant: Larry J. Cooper
Mediator: Mark LeHocky
Case Number: 3:2009cv01816
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER REQUESTING DOCTOR'S CERTIFICATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER RULING ON OBJECTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/21/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/27/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO RE-NOTICE MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/31/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating hearing 202 Motion for Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting re 170 Brinkman's Motion to Dismiss. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/21/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/15/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/14/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/5/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/30/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER AWARDING DALY ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/26/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO BE EXCUSED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/25/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting re 154 Request to Appear Telephonically at Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/22/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/3/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 140 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 109 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 92 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating hearing 109 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/20/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/4/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST OF PARTIES TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER SCHEDULING COURT TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/22/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting re 65 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Carey F. Daly, II, Randall J. Lanham. Signed by Judge Phyllis Hamilton on 11/12/09. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 37 Motion to Disqualify (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 52 Stipulation filed by Encompass Holdings Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 46 Stipulation filed by Carey F. Daly, II, Randall J. Lanham. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ALLOW LEVENE, NEALE, BENDER, RANKIN & BRILL LLP TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL OF RECORD re 43 Stipulation filed by Encompass Holdings Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/30/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/27/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encompass Holdings Inc. v. Daly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Encompass Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Paul E. Manasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daren Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey F. Daly, II
Represented By: Christopher Ralph Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall J. Lanham
Represented By: Christopher Ralph Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Larry J. Cooper
Represented By: Paul E. Manasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Mark LeHocky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?