Johnson v. American Casualty Company of Reading, PA
Plaintiff: Philip Rudolph Johnson
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, PA
Case Number: 3:2009cv02125
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/27/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending defendants time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint from 10/7/11 to 10/21/11. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/4/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Enlarging Time for Discovery for Convenience of Witness. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/13/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the deadline for completion of depositions be extended from September 15, 2011 to September 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/30/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: Defendant substitutes Woollis & Per in place of Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/25/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 25 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Exending time to Complete Mediation to January 21, 2010.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/10/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. American Casualty Company of Reading, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Rudolph Johnson
Represented By: Thomas Gerad Lewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, PA
Represented By: Jon Peter Kardassakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?