November 16, 2012 |
Filing
132
ORDER GRANTING (118 in 3:09-cv-02136-SC) MOTION for Attorney Fees PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed by Eric Schumacher, and GRANTING (119 in 3:09-cv-02136-SC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion for Final Approval of Settlement. filed by Tina Walter, Eric Schumacher, Christopher Bayless, and JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/16/2012. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012) Modified on 11/16/2012 (sclc2, COURT STAFF).
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing
117
Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting (115) Second Stipulation Regarding Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.Associated Cases: 3:09-cv-02136-SC, 3:09-cv-03543-SC(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
|
March 21, 2012 |
Filing
114
Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting (113) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-02136-SC.Associated Cases: 3:09-cv-02136-SC, 3:09-cv-03543-SC(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
|
February 8, 2012 |
Filing
107
ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying (98) Motion for Settlement in case 3:09-cv-02136-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
|
January 4, 2012 |
Filing
102
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Defendants' Response to Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/4/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
|
November 28, 2011 |
Filing
97
STIPULATION AND ORDER Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement Hearing set for 2/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Case Management Conference set for 11/29/11 is continued to 2/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/28/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
|
November 21, 2011 |
Filing
95
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Filing of Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/21/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
93
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Motions terminated: 80 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Arbitration Act and Alternative Motion to Dismiss and Strike ETF Claims; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Hughes Network Systems, LLC, Hughes Communications, Inc... Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/14/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
|
July 14, 2011 |
Filing
79
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants time to respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint to 8/4/11. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/14/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
|
July 6, 2011 |
Filing
77
ORDER DENYING (60 in 3:09-cv-02136-SC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Conditional Class Certification and Related Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion filed by Tina Walter, Eric Schumacher, Christopher Bayless (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
|
April 13, 2011 |
Filing
75
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/13/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
|
February 22, 2011 |
Filing
71
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants' time to respond to Second Amended Complaint to April 14, 2011.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/22/2011. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
69
ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 60 Motion for Settlement (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
|
January 31, 2011 |
Filing
68
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/28/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
59
STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Status Conference set for 12/3/2011 to 1/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco and Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/18/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
|
September 9, 2010 |
Filing
57
STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Status Conference from 9/17/10 to 12/3/10 at 10:00 a.m. and extending time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint to 11/19/10. Status Conference set for 12/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/9/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing
55
STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing
53
STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 6/25/10 is continued to 9/17/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/9/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
|
April 7, 2010 |
Filing
50
STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing on Motion to Dismiss from 5/7/10 to 9/3/10 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 45 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Portions of Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint., STIPULATION AND ORDER Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on April 7, 2010. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
|
March 19, 2010 |
Filing
48
STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 4/9/10 is continued to 6/25/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/19/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing
43
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendants time to respond to Plaintiff's amended consolidated class action complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/8/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part (20) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:09-cv-02136-SC (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing
29
STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Defendants Motion To Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/22/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing
17
STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: Case C-09-3543 Schumacker -v- Hughesnet, Inc., is consolidated with this action. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/27/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing
15
STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing deadlines and continuing the Case Management Conference to December 4, 2009. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/6/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
|