Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Bayer Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Bayer Corporation and Bayer AG
Case Number: 3:2009cv02145
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 220 COURT'S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/30/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/29/2011. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 176 Stipulation filed by Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER GRANTING 170 Stipulation to unseal portions of plaintiff's brief; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/3/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING 139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Documents Cited in Bayer's Motion in Limine filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer AG, Bayer Schering Pharma AG; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/10/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying briefing schedules re summary judgment motions; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/2/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER amended pretrial and trial schedules; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/16/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER to file 2nd amended complaint; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/21/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference continued to 7/19/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/29/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending mediation deadline to 5/13/2010; Status Conference continued to 5/17/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/12/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Protocl for Production of Documents and Information; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/28/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Bayer Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyx Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley Allen Waugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?