Lee v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Pamela Lee
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Interested Party: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv02176
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Ware
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2014 Filing 113 USCA Memorandum as to #105 Notice of Appeal filed by Pamela Lee (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER of USCA as to #105 Notice of Appeal filed by Pamela Lee (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
May 24, 2012 Filing 111 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 20, 2010, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/14/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
April 27, 2012 Filing 110 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 12/20/10 before Judge Susan Illston, (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 109 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 12/22/2010 before Judge Susan Illston, re #105 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 5/14/2012. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 4/19/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 108 USCA Case Number 12-15579 9th Circuit for #105 Notice of Appeal filed by Pamela Lee. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 107 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #105 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 docket sheet, #2 cover letter, #3 appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 106 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: #1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Pamela Lee. Appeal of Judgment #104 (FEE STATUS: PAID, Receipt Number 34611071726) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 104 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on February 28, 2012. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting #89 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings; denying #91 Motion for Declaratory Judgment (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 13, 2012 Filing 102 Minute Entry: Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order.Motion Hearing held on 2/13/2012 before James Ware (Date Filed: 2/13/2012) re #89 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, #91 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Pamela Lee. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/13/2012)
January 30, 2012 Filing 101 REPLY (re #91 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Judgment ) filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 30, 2012 Filing 100 REPLY (re #89 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings ) filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re #94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Continuance of Briefing Dates and the Hearing Date for the Parties' Motions filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Continuance of Briefing Dates and the Hearing Date for the Parties' Motions, #89 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings , #91 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Judgment. Responses due by 1/23/2012. Replies due by 1/30/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/24/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 98 DECLARATION of Laurence F. Padway in Opposition to #97 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Laurence F. Padway filed byPamela Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Metlife's Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2. Metlife's Supp. Disclosures)(Related document(s) #97 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 97 RESPONSE (re #89 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings ) Pamela Lee's Objection to the Declaration of Cindy Broadwater filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 96 RESPONSE (re #89 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings ) Pamela Lee's Opposition to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Second Motion for Judgment Under F. R. C. P., Rule 52 filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 95 RESPONSE (re #91 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Judgment ) filed byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Continuance of Briefing Dates and the Hearing Date for the Parties' Motions filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Ware for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/12/12. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER OF RECUSAL (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 91 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Pamela Lee. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/20/2012. Replies due by 1/27/2012. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 90 Proposed Order re #89 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 1/20/2012. Replies due by 1/27/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Cindy Broadwater)(Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
November 23, 2011 Filing 88 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2011 before Illston (Date Filed: 11/23/2011). Further Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 03:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 87 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Updated) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
September 20, 2011 Filing 86 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 84 Letter from Laurence F. Padway. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 83 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Notice of Change of Firm Name (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 82 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #80 Brief DECLARATION RE LATE FILING AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed byPamela Lee. (Related document(s) #80 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 81 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #80 Brief PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE STANDARD OF REVIEW filed byPamela Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs. Initial Disclosures)(Related document(s) #80 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 80 Brief PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE STANDARD OF REVIEW filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 79 Declaration of Joanne Carroll in Support of #78 Brief filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M - Part 1, #16 Exhibit M - Part 2-1, #17 Exhibit M - Part 2-2, #18 Exhibit M - Part 2-3, #19 Exhibit M - Part 3, #20 Exhibit M - Part 4, #21 Exhibit M - Part 5, #22 Exhibit M - Part 6, #23 Exhibit M - Part 7, #24 Exhibit M - Part 8, #25 Exhibit M - Part 9, #26 Exhibit M - Part 10, #27 Exhibit M - Part 11, #28 Exhibit M - Part 12, #29 Exhibit M - Part 13, #30 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) #78 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 78 Brief Supplemental Brief Regarding Plan Documents filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 28, 2010 Filing 77 Letter from Laurence F. Padway. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 22, 2010 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/20/2010 before Illston (Date Filed: 12/22/2010). (Court Reporter K. Sullivan.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/22/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 75 OBJECTIONS to re #70 Memorandum in Opposition, #71 Declaration in Opposition Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 74 Reply Memorandum re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 73 Declaration of Joanne Carroll In Support of Defendant/Real Party In Interest's Reply in Support of #62 Its Motion for Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2, #5 Exhibit C - Part 3, #6 Exhibit C - Part 4, #7 Exhibit C - Part 5, #8 Exhibit C - Part 6, #9 Exhibit D)(Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/23/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 Filing 72 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #70 Memorandum in Opposition, #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Laurence F. Padway filed byPamela Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Murphy Reports pt 1, #2 Exhibit Murphy Reports pt 2, #3 Exhibit 2 Topper reports, #4 Exhibit Topper reports pt 2)(Related document(s) #62 , #70 , #54 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 71 DECLARATION of Pamela Lee in Opposition to #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #70 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Pamela Lee filed byPamela Lee. (Related document(s) #62 , #70 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 70 Memorandum in Opposition re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Cross-Motion filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 9, 2010 Filing 69 Letter from Laurence F. Padway in Response to MetLife's Submissions (Doc. 66-68). (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 68 Declaration of Erin A. Cornell in Support of #66 Letter filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-N, #3 Exhibit O-X)(Related document(s) #66 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 67 Declaration of Rebecca A. Hull in Support of #66 Letter filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #66 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 8, 2010 Filing 66 Letter from Rebecca A. Hull in Response to Padway Letter Brief (Document No. 64). (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
November 6, 2010 Filing 65 Reply to Objections to Evidence filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/6/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2010 Filing 64 Letter from Laurence F. Padway to Hon. Susan Illston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 63 Exhibit A to #58 Notice of Filing Adminsitrative Record by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 62 Motion for Judgment and Opposition to #54 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Filing 61 Proposed Order Granting Judgment in Favor of Defendants and Counterclaimant by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 60 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Submitted With #54 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; REQUEST to Strike by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Erin A. Cornell in support of #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #54 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Filing 58 NOTICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company of Filing Administrative Record (Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 56 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Briefing Schedule by Pamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 55 Declaration of Laurence F. Padway in Support of #54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byPamela Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs Supp Answers to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Defs Supp Answers to Request for Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit C.V. of Leonid L. Topper, M.D., #4 Exhibit C.V. of Mark Schroder, M.D., #5 Exhibit C.V. of Keven Anne Murphy, Ph.D., #6 Exhibit Text Book of Pain, #7 Exhibit Principals of Neurology, #8 Exhibit Depression and Pain Comorbidity, #9 Exhibit Neuropsychological Assessment, #10 Exhibit Compendium of Neuropsychologial Tests, #11 Exhibit February 27,2004 Notice from Insurance Commissioner, #12 Exhibit Defendant's Initial Disclosures)(Related document(s) #54 ) (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pamela Lee. Motion Hearing set for 12/20/2010 09:00 AM. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 53 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Briefing Schedule by Pamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re: briefing schedule; continuing hearing to 12/20/10 @ 9 a.m. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 51 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Briefing Schedule by Pamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND AMENDING JULY 14, 2010 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 16, 2010 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration re Order (Doc #48) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL, DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE (Docket Nos. 40, 47) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION to Strike #40 Letter,, specifically Exhs 9, 10 and 11 of Document No. 40 filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 46 Request for Judicial Notice re #45 Letter Brief filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #45 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 45 Letter Brief re #40 Letter,, filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #40 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER extending briefing schedule re #43 . (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 43 STIPULATION and [Proposed Order] to Continue Dates by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Cornell, Erin) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER continuing motions to 9/17/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 41 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 40 Letter from Laurence F. Padway. (Attachments: #1 12/19/09 Order re Discovery, #2 Defendant's Response to Request for Production of Documents, #3 Defendants Response to Interrogatories, #4 Curricula Vitae of three of Metlife's consulting physicians, #5 Plaintiff's Meet & Confer, #6 Plaintiff's letter to Metlife of January 22, 2008, #7 Plaintiff's letter of February 17, 2009, #8 Plaintiff's letter of November 10, 2009 to Judge Illston, #9 Deposition of Rosemary Harmon, #10 Deposition of F. Anderson, #11 Deposition of Ms. Setzer)(Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 39 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 4/27/2010, case not settled, further discussions expected by 5/14/2010, mediation complete. Signed by Mediator, Robert S. Luft, dated 4/28/2010. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER continuing motion hearing to 8/6/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 37 STIPULATION to Extend Briefing Dates by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 18, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 4/27/2010 09:00 AM., at JAMS Two Embarcadero Center, Suite 1500, San Francisco, CA 94111. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Rebecca A. Hull (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [Docket No. 30] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 29, 2010 Filing 34 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 26, 2010 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on February 8, 2010 at 1:00 p.m. Mediator has provided a dial-in number and access code to all participants. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 14, 2010 Filing 33 Memorandum in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; Change hearing date Memorandum re Motion for Extension of Time filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 32 Proposed Order re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; Change hearing date by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 31 Declaration of Cari A. Cohorn in Support of #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; Change hearing date filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Related document(s) #30 ) (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment; Change hearing date filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Pre MED phone conference scheduled on Monday, January 25, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. Mediator has provided a dial-in number and access code to counsel. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 5, 2010 Filing 29 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Robert S. Luft as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY MOTION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 28, 2009 Filing 27 Letter from Laurence F. Padway. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 25 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 7, 2009 Filing 24 Letter from Laurence F. Padway re discovery. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 30, 2009 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Rebecca A. Hull in Opposition to #20 Letter filed byKaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 30, 2009 Filing 22 Letter from counsel for Defendant/Real Party In Interest, Rebecca A. Hull. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 21 Letter from Laurence F. Padway . (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 20 Letter from Laurence F. Padway. (Attachments: #1 Order from Walker v. Metlife, #2 Order from Dine v. Metropolitan Life, #3 Transcript from April 2, 2009-Walker v. Metlife)(Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 19 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/25/2009 before Illston (Date Filed: 9/30/2009). Case continued to 2/26/10 for Cross Motions for Summary Judgment () (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2009)
September 18, 2009 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
August 25, 2009 Filing 17 ANSWER TO #15 COUNTERCLAIM byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 8/25/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2009 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 Filing 15 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Pamela Lee byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 8/3/2009) Modified on 8/4/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2009 Filing 14 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2009 02:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed byPamela Lee. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/10/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Cohorn, Cari) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DFT/REAL PARTY IN INTEREST TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Responsive pleading due by 7/24/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/22/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE To Defendant and Rel Part in Interest re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 7/6/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Hull, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 6 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 5 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pamela Lee.. (Padway, Laurence) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 6/10/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2009. Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2009 01:30 PM. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Erisa Benefits against Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611032266). Filed by Pamela Lee. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2009: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lee
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Represented By: Cari Ann Cohorn
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erin A. Cornell
Represented By: Cari Ann Cohorn
Represented By: Rebecca A. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?