Ride The Ducks International, LLC v. Bay Quackers, LLC
Plaintiff: Ride The Ducks International, LLC
Defendant: Bay Quackers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv02195
Filed: May 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINE TO CONDUCT MEDIATION. The deadline to complete mediation is continued to March 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 9/18/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR LEAD COUNSEL TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 16-10(A). Dutro E. Campbell, II, is granted permission to appear by telephone for the September 18, 2009 Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 14, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ride The Ducks International, LLC v. Bay Quackers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ride The Ducks International, LLC
Represented By: James F. Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Quackers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?