Conceptus, Inc. v. Hologic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Conceptus, Inc.
Defendant: Hologic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02280
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 534 APPENDIX RE JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON ENABLEMENT re 533 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 9, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 528 ORDER RE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL re 517 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conceptus' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits A, B, C & D to Declaration of M. Patricia Thayer in Support of Conceptus' Reply in Support of its Motion for Permanent Injunction and to filed by Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 20, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON DECEMBER 22. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 19, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, Order by Judge Alsup denying 473 Motion for Directed Verdict; finding as moot 474 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/17/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 475 FINAL CHARGE TO THE JURY. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER REGARDING ACCEPTABLE NON-INFRINGING ALTERNATIVES AND LOST PROFITS re 449 Brief, filed by Hologic, Inc., 450 Brief filed by Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 6, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 445 NOTICE REGARDING NARROWING OF OBJECTIONS TO DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 3, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR "CLARIFICATION" re 437 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's September 27 Order filed by Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 29, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE RE TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 28, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish refreshments for the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/27/11. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 13, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 11, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 374 MOTION for Leave to File for Summary Judgment on Indirect Infringement in view of Global-Tech Appliances, Inc. v. SEB S.A. filed by Hologic, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER SETTING TRIAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 16, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR CASE STATUS TELECONFERENCE re 370 Letter filed by Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER ALLOWING EXPERT REPORT AND LIMITED SUPPLEMENTAL PRODUCTION OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION re 360 Stipulation filed by Hologic, Inc., Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 10, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 358 Stipulation filed by Hologic, Inc., Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 22, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 15, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER RE BRINGING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM FOR DECEMBER 9, 2010 HEARING re 336 Stipulation filed by Hologic, Inc., Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 3, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER GRANTING IN PART ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL CONCEPTUS, INC. CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION re 298 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Conceptus' Opposition to Hologic's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Conceptus, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 29, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS A AND B TO THE SKLENAR DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 23, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER CONSOLIDATING HEARINGS AND REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 18, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 17, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (2/28/2011) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (2/7/2011). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/14/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DECLARE ATTORNEY-CLIENT PRIVILEGE WAIVED DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO COMPEL AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 247 Motion to Amend/Correct]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING RESCHEDULING OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference previously set for 11/15/10 at 11:00 AM, has been re-set for 11/30/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/10/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge Alsup granting 238 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 183 Motion to Compel]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 24, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CRITIQUES. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TENTATIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER AND REQUEST FOR CRITIQUE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 16, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING IN PART STIPULATED REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT TO THE MARCH 10 HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS IN.PDF FORMAT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference re-set for 3/18/2010 at09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Settlement conference statements due 3/4/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/26/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 20, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING ASSERTED CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER APPROVING JOINT PROPOSED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 16, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Alsup (re 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RE MOTION TO PERMIT DELIVERY AND USE OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 3, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 28, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 16, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER (Patent Case)**NOTE: Amended to reflect 10/9/9 as Dft's response date for counter-proposal** Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/01/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE RE JILL J. HO. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/18/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE 21 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSELby Judge Alsup. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/16/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 9 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conceptus, Inc. v. Hologic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conceptus, Inc.
Represented By: April Michelle Wurster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hologic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?