Blum v. Indy Mac Mortgage Services et al
Plaintiff: Chris Blum
Defendant: Indy Mac Mortgage Services, Indymac Federal Bank, FSB, NDEXWEST, LLC, Washington Mutual Bank and Curt Humphrey
Case Number: 3:2009cv02286
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REMANDING CASE. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL of Defendant Washington Mutual Bank with prejudice, re doc 56 Stipulation filed by Chris Blum. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/27/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 49 Order filed by Chris Blum. Pursuant to the Stipulation, the hearing date for each of the motions previously set for 12/10/2009 shall be continued to 2/4/2010 at 10:00 AM. The case management conference is re-set to 2/18/2010 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/6/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER re docs 41 40 filed by Chris Blum. The hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction (doc #1), IndyMac's motion to dismiss (doc #9) Plaintiff's motion to remand and attorneys' fees (doc #15) and NDEX's motion to dismiss (doc #32) shall be continued to 12/10/2009 at 10:00 AM. Briefing shall be modified in accordance with the new hearing date and Civil Local Rule 7-3. An early settlement conference with a Mag Judge shall be held no later than 12/31/ 2009. All parties and their counsel will be required to attend. The case management conference shall be continued from 11/12/2009 until 1/7/2010 at 3:30 PM. The temporary restraining orders shall remain in effect until at least 12/17/2009. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/23/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blum v. Indy Mac Mortgage Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Blum
Represented By: Peter F. Lacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indy Mac Mortgage Services
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Federal Bank, FSB
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEXWEST, LLC
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt Humphrey
Represented By: Steven Corson Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?