Yarber v. County of Santa Clara Probation Department
Plaintiff: Maurice D. Yarber
Defendant: County of Santa Clara Probation Department
Case Number: 3:2009cv02298
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of County of Santa Clara Probation Department against Maurice D. Yarber. The County of Santa Claras motion is hereby GRANTED, and the Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED without leave to amend. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME; CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. No later than November 16, 2009, plaintiff shall file and serve his opposition to defenda nt's motion to dismiss. No later than November 25, 2009, defendant shall file its reply. The hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is continued from November 6, 2009 to December 11, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 20, 2009 to January 22, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 15, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT; SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO OPERATIVE PLEADING; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF RE: SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS ON DE FENDANT. The deadline for Yarber to file any First Amended Complaint is September 4, 2009. If, as of September 4, 2009, Yarber has not filed a First Amended Complaint, the action shall proceed on the initial complaint filed by Yarber on May 22, 2009. The deadline for the County to file a response to the operative pleading is extended to September 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarber v. County of Santa Clara Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice D. Yarber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara Probation Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?