Key Source International, Inc v. Apex Maritime Shipping Company et al
Plaintiff: Key Source International, Inc
Defendant: Apex Maritime Shipping Company and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv02389
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING HEARING Show Cause Response due by 3/12/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 9, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REOPENING CASE. MOTION TO STRIKE RESET FOR 3/25/2010 AT 8:00 A.M. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/23/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/22/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: (1) GRANTING HARTFORD'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SEVENTH CLAIM WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND (2) DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S EIGHTH, NINTH AND ELEVENTH CLAIMS by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key Source International, Inc v. Apex Maritime Shipping Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Key Source International, Inc
Represented By: Donald Charles Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Maritime Shipping Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Stewart McLay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?