Capital Trust, Inc. v. Lembi et al
Plaintiff: Capital Trust, Inc.
Defendant: Walter R. Lembi, Frank E. Lembi, Billie Salevouris, Billie Z. Salevouris, David M. Raynal and Raplh Dayan
Case Number: 3:2009cv02492
Filed: June 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING 140 Stipulation Regarding Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 138 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines and TERMINATING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 2, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION, WITHDRAWING MOTIONS AND REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/1/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING 130 Stipulation to Extend Date for Completion of Mediation and Hearing Date for Motions for Summary Judgment AS TO: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, 84 MOTION to Intervene, 85 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 128 Stipulation filed by Veritas-B Mezz B7, LLC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/17/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING 125 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Complete Mediation and to Continue Hearing on Motions Scheduled for January 28th: Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/14/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER RE HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 13, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER GRANTING 122 Stipulation to Continue Deadline to Complete Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 13, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR BILLIE SALEVOURIS TO ATTEND THE MEDIATION TELEPHONICALLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 1, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS, PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 96 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date and Modify Briefing Schedules Re Motions Set for Hearing on November 5, 2010. Hearing on Motions set for 12/10/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/14/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER APPROVING 94 Substitution of Counsel.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/12/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT BY NO LATER THAN 10:00 A.M. AUGUST 11, 2010. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REMAINS AS PREVIOUSLY SET, AUGUST 13, 2010.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ***Deadlines terminated. ORDER GRANTING 76 Joint Request to Vacate Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 7, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010) Modified on 5/7/2010 (jswlc3, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/29/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Regarding Correspondence Regarding Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING 58 Stipulation re Expert Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 25, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/21/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE Right to Attach Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 16, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE to Application for Order Shortening Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 19, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Tentative Ruling and Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 17, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 30, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Trust, Inc. v. Lembi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Trust, Inc.
Represented By: H. Joseph Escher, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter R. Lembi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank E. Lembi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Salevouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Z. Salevouris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Raynal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raplh Dayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?