LaRussa v. Twitter Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Anthony LaRussa
Defendant: Twitter Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02503
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2009 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony LaRussa (McCoy, Gregory) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Twitter Inc.. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Twitter Inc. (Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 5, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2009. Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2009 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/5/09. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 3 Statement re 1 Notice of Removal by Twitter Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Twitter Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL /no process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 09-488101. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611032932). Filed byTwitter Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009) (ga, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaRussa v. Twitter Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony LaRussa
Represented By: Gregory L. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter Inc.
Represented By: Leslie A Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?