Herson et al v. City of Richmond
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Herson and East Bay Outdoor, Inc.
Defendant: City of Richmond
Case Number: 3:2009cv02516
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2014 Filing 219 USCA MEMORANDUM as to 177 Notice of Appeal. AFFIRMED. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
May 9, 2012 Filing 218 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/06/11, before Judge PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2012. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 217 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 28, 2010, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2012. (rhm, ) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 216 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 5, 2010, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-7530, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2012. (rhm, ) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Adopting 212 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation and Denying 193 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2012)
March 16, 2012 Filing 213 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kirkland & Ellis LLP filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 3/30/2012. Replies due by 4/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McConnell, Michael) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 212 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Objections due by 3/23/2012. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/9/3012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 1, 2012 Filing 211 Minute Entry: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees Hearing held on 3/1/2012 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 3/1/2012) re 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2012)
February 27, 2012 Filing 210 Order by Hon. Laurel Beeler granting 209 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012) Modified on 2/27/2012 (lblc1, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2012 Filing 209 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 21, 2012 Filing 208 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 30, 2011, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 16, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees for 3/1/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel may appear telephonically by contacting the courtroom deputy, Lashanda Scott at (510) 637-3525 to make the necessary arrangements. The court will initiate the call. (This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this entry). (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 207 REPLY (re 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 206 Costs Taxed in amount of $6,839.73 against Plaintiff Jeffrey Herson, et al. and for Defendant City of Richmond (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/20/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 204 Amended Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 08/05/09, 05/05/10, 07/28/10, 04/06/11, 07/28/11, 11/30/11 before Judge Hamilton, Magistrate Judge Beeler, (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 1/19/2012) Modified on 1/20/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2012 Filing 203 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 204 . *** Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 08/05/09, 05/05/10, 07/28/10, 04/06/11, 07/28/11, 11/20/11 before Judge Hamilton, Magistrate Judge Beeler, (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 1/19/2012) Modified on 1/20/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2012 Filing 202 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 201 Opposition/Response to Motion for Attorneys Fees filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Offer of Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 2 Herson Settlement Demand, # 3 Exhibit 3 Herson Deposition)(Related document(s) 201 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 201 RESPONSE (re 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 200 MANDATE of USCA as to 177 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 199 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES re 198 Stipulation, filed by Jeffrey Herson, City of Richmond, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/4/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Response due by 1/13/2012. Reply due by 1/25/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012) Modified on 1/5/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2011 Filing 198 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Hearing Date on Motion for Attorneys Fees by City of Richmond, East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Signature Attestation)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 12/29/2011) Modified on 12/30/2011 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2011 Filing 197 USCA Case Number 11-18028 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 196 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc.. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 20, 2011 Filing 196 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 191 Judgment, 190 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 137 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Filing fee $ 455. Appeal Record due by 1/19/2012. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 195 Declaration of Joshua R. Furman in Support of 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 193 ) (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 194 Declaration of Jeffrey Herson in Support of 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 193 ) (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 193 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 1/3/2012. Replies due by 1/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees)(Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 19, 2011 Filing 192 BILL OF COSTS by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemization of Costs, # 2 Exhibit Documentation of Costs)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 5, 2011 Filing 191 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/5/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 161 Motion for Summary Judgment (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 30, 2011 Filing 189 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/30/2011) re 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond, 160 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 188 MANDATE of USCA as to 183 (11-17421) is dismissed Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 4, 2011 Receipt in the amount of $18,750.00 for Jeffrey Herson. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 187 NOTICE by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson of Posting Bond (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER APPROVING SUPERSEDEAS BOND re 184 Stipulation, filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 185 USCA Case Number 11-17421 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 183 Notice of Appeal filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc.. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 184 STIPULATION Re: Posting of Supersedeas Bond Pending Appeal of Orders Awarding and Affirming Sanctions by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Approving Supersedeas Bond)(Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 176 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Filing fee $ 455 receipt no. 44611007741. Appeal Record due by 11/10/2011. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 179 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 181 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 7/28/2011 before Judge Hon. Laurel Beeler, (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 180 Declaration of Joshua R. Furman in Support of 179 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 179 ) (Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 179 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Approving Substitution)(Furman, Joshua) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 14, 2011 Filing 178 USCA Case Number 11-17181 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 177 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc.. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 171 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 Filing 175 CLERKS NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on November 30, 2011 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 3 on the 3rd floor of the Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California, the HONORABLE PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON will conduct the hearing on the Supplemental Cross Motions for Summary Judgment previously noticed for September 21, 2011, in this matter., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 160 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment, 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 Filing 177 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 170 Order on Motion for Sanctions by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Filing fee $ 455, receipt no. 34611064493. Appeal Record due by 10/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
September 9, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 174 DECLARATION of Richard Mitchell in Opposition to 160 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Related document(s) 160 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 173 RESPONSE (re 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment, 160 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 31, 2011 Filing 172 RESPONSE (re 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
August 19, 2011 Filing 171 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Responses due by 9/2/2011. Replies due by 9/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/19/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 170 Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 114 Motion for Sanctions.(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 8, 2011 Filing 169 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 28, 2011, before Judge Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2011. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 168 Proposed Order re 160 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 167 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2011 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 7/28/2011). (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Richmond re 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment, 162 Declaration in Support, 165 Proposed Order, 164 Declaration in Support, 163 Declaration in Support (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 165 Proposed Order re 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 164 Declaration of Jim Ballard in Support of 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 161 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 163 Declaration of Hector Lopez in Support of 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 161 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 162 Declaration of Richard Mitchell in Support of 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 161 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 161 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 8/31/2011. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 160 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 8/10/2011. Replies due by 8/17/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 153 Motion to Continue (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Richmond re 157 Proposed Order, 156 Opposition/Response to Motion for Contiuance (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 23, 2011 Filing 157 Proposed Order re 156 Opposition/Response to Motion for Continuance by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 6/23/2011) Modified on 6/24/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2011 Filing 156 RESPONSE (re 153 Administrative MOTION for Continuance ) filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 152 Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael W. McConnell (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 21, 2011 Filing 154 Declaration of Michael W. McConnell in Support of 153 Administrative Motion for Continuance, filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 153 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Filing 153 Administrative MOTION for Continuance, filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton GRANTING 151 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael W. McConnell. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2011) Modified on 6/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2011 Filing 151 MOTION of Michael W. McConnell for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007159.) filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 15, 2011 Filing 150 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 149 CLERKS NOTICE: Defendant's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation Hearing set for 7/28/2011 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 AMENDED ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Court recuses itself from hearing this matter regarding the sanctions motion. The Clerk shall reassign this matter forthwith to another judge. The hearing on the motion for sanctions set for May 17, 2011shall be vacated and will be reset by the newly assigned judge. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/13/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ** IGNORE THIS ENTRY. SEE DOCKET NO. 148. ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/13/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/13/2011 (cgk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/13/2011 (cgk, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated, the 5/17/2011 hearing date re sanctions is vacated. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Discovery (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 145 Stipulation filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/9/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 9, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated pursuant to 146 Order Re: Summary Judgment. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 145 STIPULATION re 137 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ; Proposed Order by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING EXPERT DISCOVERY re 139 Stipulation filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 143 Declaration of James Ballard in Support of 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 114 , 140 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 142 Declaration of Andrew Crain in Support of 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by City of Richmond. (Related document(s) 114 , 140 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 141 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 114 , 140 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 140 REPLY (re 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation ) in Support of Motion filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 139 STIPULATION Extending Expert Discovery; [Proposed] Order by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 138 CLERKS NOTICE re 114 Motion Hearing. The hearing on Defendant's Discovery Motion for Sanctions previously set for May 17, 2011 at 4:00p.m. has been reset for 9:00 a.m. before Judge Laporte in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco, California. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011) Modified on 4/29/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 88 Summary Judgment in Part and Denying Summary Judgment in Part (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 136 Declaration of Andrew Flagg in Support of 134 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 134 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 4/18/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Filing 135 Declaration of Jeffrey Herson in Support of 134 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 134 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 4/18/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Filing 134 RESPONSE (re 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation ) filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 4/18/2011) Modified on 4/19/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2011 Filing 133 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/6/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 4/6/2011) re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2011)
March 30, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 30, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 132 CLERKS NOTICE RE CHAMBERS COPIES (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 131 Request for Judicial Notice re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 130 Declaration of Richard Mitchell in Support of 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 129 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 128 REPLY (re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 123 Stipulation filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/23/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2011 04:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 03/21/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 124 Declaration of Winter King in Support of 123 Stipulation Extending Hearing Date on Motion for Summary Judgment and Deadline for Defendant's Reply filed byCity of Richmond. (Related document(s) 123 ) (Prange, Jaclyn) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 123 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Hearing Date on 88 Motion for Summary Judgment and Deadline for Defendant's Reply by City of Richmond. (Prange, Jaclyn) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/18/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 Filing 122 Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of 121 Stipulation, Extending Hearing Date on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 121 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/18/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2011 Filing 121 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date on Defendant's Discovery Motion for Sanctions by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/17/2011) Modified on 3/18/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES and Setting on Defendant's Motion for Sanctions for Spoliation 114 . Hearing set for 4/25/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/15/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 14, 2011 ***Hearings/deadlines terminated. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Discovery (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/14/2011. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY DISCOVERY CUTOFF by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 104 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 117 Proposed Order re 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 116 Declaration of Andrew Crain in Support of 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 115 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10-1, # 11 Exhibit 10-2, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) 114 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 114 MOTION for Sanctions for Spoliation filed by City of Richmond. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 113 EXHIBITS re 111 Declaration in Support,, filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 27-Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 28-Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 28-Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 28-Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 28-Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 29, # 7 Exhibit 30, # 8 Exhibit 31, # 9 Exhibit 32, # 10 Exhibit 33-Part 1, # 11 Exhibit 33-Part 2, # 12 Exhibit 34, # 13 Exhibit 35, # 14 Exhibit 36)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 112 EXHIBITS re 111 Declaration in Support,, filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 20-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 22, # 5 Exhibit 23, # 6 Exhibit 24, # 7 Exhibit 25, # 8 Exhibit 26-Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 26-Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 26-Part 3, # 11 Exhibit 26-Part 4)(Related document(s) 111 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 111 Declaration of Jeffrey A. Herson in Support of 109 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Jeffrey A. Herson in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8-Part 1, # 9 Exhibit 8-Part 2, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Supplement 18)(Related document(s) 109 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 110 Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of 109 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 109 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 109 RESPONSE (re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 108 Proposed Order re 104 Denying Administrative Motion to Modify Discovery Cutoff by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Filing 107 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 106 Opposition/Response to Motion to Modify Discovery Cutoff filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 106 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 106 RESPONSE (re 104 MOTION Administrative Motion (L.R. 7-11) to Modify Discovery Cutoff to Allow Taking of Deposition of Richard Mitchell ) filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 105 Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of 104 MOTION Administrative Motion (L.R. 7-11) to Modify Discovery Cutoff to Allow Taking of Deposition of Richard Mitchell filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 104 MOTION Administrative Motion (L.R. 7-11) to Modify Discovery Cutoff to Allow Taking of Deposition of Richard Mitchell filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 103 Letter from Karl Olson withdrawing the formally-noticed Motion to Modify Discovery Cut-Off to Allow Taking of Deposition of Richard Mitchell. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 102 Declaration in Support of 101 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Modify Discovery Cutoff to Allow Taking of Deposition of Richard Mitchell MOTION to Take Deposition from Richard Mitchell filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 2, 2011 Filing 101 MOTION for Discovery Notice of Motion and Motion to Modify Discovery Cutoff to Allow Taking of Deposition of Richard Mitchell, MOTION to Take Deposition from Richard Mitchell filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DATES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURE, DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 98 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 15, 2011 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Disclosure of Experts due by 4/29/2011. Expert Discovery due by 6/3/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 99 STIPULATION re 98 MOTION Continuing Hearing Date on Summary Judgment Motion, Dates for Expert Disclosure and Discovery, and Pretrial Conference by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2011 Filing 98 MOTION Continuing Hearing Date on Summary Judgment Motion, Dates for Expert Disclosure and Discovery, and Pretrial Conference (Local Rule 7-11) filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2011 Filing 97 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Karl Olson (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 95 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
February 1, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
January 30, 2011 Filing 95 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to continue hearing on 88 Motion for Summary Judgment by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Beauvais, David) (Filed on 1/30/2011) Modified on 1/31/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 94 Proposed Order Granting 88 Motion for Summary Judgment by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 93 Declaration of Gautam Manandhar in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 92 Declaration of Yader A. Bermudez in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 91 Declaration of Richard Mitchell in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 90 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-A. Long Dep., # 2 Exhibit 1-B. Long Dep., # 3 Exhibit 1-C. Long Dep., # 4 Exhibit 1-D. Long Dep., # 5 Exhibit 1-E. Long Dep., # 6 Exhibit 2. Velasco Dep., # 7 Exhibit 3. Herson Dep., # 8 Exhibit 4. Benjamin Dep.)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 89 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of 88 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2011 Filing 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Richmond. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY CUTOFF by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2011)
December 29, 2010 Filing 86 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Stipulation & Proposed Order filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Beauvais, David) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS re 83 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS re 82 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Jeffrey Herson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/28/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 20, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by David J. Beauvais for East Bay Outdoor, Inc. and Proposed Order. (Beauvais, David) (Filed on 12/20/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by David J. Beauvais for Jeffrey Herson and Proposed Order. (Beauvais, David) (Filed on 12/20/2010) Modified on 12/21/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO MODIFY CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 74 Motion for Administrative Relief. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Non-Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2010. Disclosure of Experts due by 3/25/2011. Expert Discovery due by 5/11/2011. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 3/2/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2011 08:30 AM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 80 Memorandum in Opposition re 74 Second MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 79 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 78 Proposed Order re 74 Second MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 77 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 74 Second MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order (Revised) filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production to Herson, # 2 Exhibit Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production to East Bay Outdoor, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiff Herson Letter to Defendant re: document production)(Related document(s) 74 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 76 Declaration of Winter King in Support of 74 Second MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order filed byCity of Richmond. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 75 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 77 . *** Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 74 Second MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order filed byCity of Richmond. (Related document(s) 74 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2010) Modified on 10/29/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2010 Filing 74 Second MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order filed by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
August 23, 2010 Filing 73 ANSWER to 63 Third Amended Complaint (Third Amended Complaint) byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/23/2010) Modified on 8/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 67 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Non-Expert Discovery due by 11/1/2010. Disclosure of Experts due by 1/11/2011. Expert Discovery due by 2/24/2011. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 12/10/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 4/18/2011 08:30 AM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEPOSITION BEYOND DISCOVERY CUTOFF re 62 Stipulation filed by City of Richmond. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/17/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 70 Memorandum in Opposition re 67 Amended MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bostwick, Gary) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 69 Proposed Order re 67 Modifying Case Management and Pretrial Order-Revised by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 Filing 68 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn In Support of 67 REVISED Motion for Administrative Relief filed by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 Filing 67 Amended MOTION Administrative Relief to Extend Deadlines in Case Management Order filed by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 66 Proposed Order Modifying Case Management and Pretrial Order by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 65 Declaration of Matthew D. Zinn in Support of 64 MOTION Administrative-Extend Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff & Dispositive Motion Deadline filed byCity of Richmond. (Related document(s) 64 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 64 MOTION Administrative-Extend Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff & Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 63 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Richmond. Filed byJeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-4, # 2 Exhibit 5-8)(Jassy, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 8/11/2010) Modified on 8/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2010 Filing 62 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Deposition Beyond Discovery Cutoff; [Proposed] Order by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting in part and Denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 60 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 7/28/2010) re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by City of Richmond. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2010)
July 14, 2010 Filing 59 Request for Judicial Notice re 58 Reply Memorandum ISO of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex E to SRJN, # 2 Exhibit Ex F to SRJN, # 3 Exhibit Ex G to SRJN)(Related document(s) 58 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 14, 2010 Filing 58 Reply Memorandum re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 53 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/9/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 56 Proposed Order re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Jassy, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 55 OBJECTIONS to re 51 Request for Judicial Notice, in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Jassy, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 54 Memorandum in Opposition re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Jassy, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 53 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Alan R. Herson for Plaintiffs (Herson, Alan) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 52 Proposed Order re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 51 Request for Judicial Notice re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D)(Related document(s) 50 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by City of Richmond. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 49 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Richmond. Filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Herson, Alan) (Filed on 5/21/2010) Modified on 5/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 41 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in Part and Denying Motion in Part (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 5/5/2010) re 41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by City of Richmond. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2010)
April 21, 2010 Filing 46 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice re 41 Motion For Judgment on the Pleadings filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex D to Supp RJN, # 2 Exhibit Ex E to Supp RJN)(Related document(s) 45 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 4/21/2010) Modified on 4/22/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2010 Filing 45 Reply Memorandum in Support of re 41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 4/21/2010) Modified on 4/22/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2010 Filing 44 Memorandum in Opposition to re 41 Richmond's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc.. (Herson, Alan) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/12/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2010 Filing 43 Proposed Order Granting re 41 Defendant City of Richmond's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by City of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/30/2010) Modified on 3/31/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2010 Filing 42 Request for Judicial Notice re 41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to MJP RJN, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to MJP RJN, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to MJP RJN)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by City of Richmond. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 40 NOTICE by East Bay Outdoor, Inc. of Incorrect Address of Plaintiffs' Counsel in Civil Docket (Herson, Alan) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
November 12, 2009 Filing 39 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 38 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc.. Filed byJeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Herson, Alan) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Alan R. Herson attorney for Plaintiffs (Herson, Alan) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 35 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/20/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 35 STIPULATION Extending Time to File Amended Complaint by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Corcoran, Kelly) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/15/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 33 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/10/2009 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 9/10/2009), Case referred to Private ADR. Non-Expert Discovery due by 8/25/2010. Disclosure of Experts due by 11/30/2010. Expert Discovery due by 1/13/2011. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 10/27/2010. Jury Trial set for 2/28/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 Stipulation filed by Jeffrey Herson, City of Richmond, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/10/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 31 CLERKS NOTICE Effective September 14, 2009, Judge Phyllis Hamilton's courtroom and chambers will be located in the Oakland Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 3rd floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612.On or after September 14, 2009, all filings for matters pending on Judge Hamiltons docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers' copies of documents must be made at the Oakland Courthouse.The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged.Please note that all of Judge Hamilton's case files will be moved to the Oakland Courthouse, therefore all cases numbers assigned to her will be changed slightly to reflect the correct venue. Previously, all case numbers started with "3:" to indicate the San Francisco office (Example: 3:09-cv-12345-PJH). As of September 14th, 2009, all of Judge Hamilton's case files will begin with "4:" to indicate the Oakland office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 4:09-cv-12345-PJH). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 09-12345 (YY-NNNNN).For information on the Oakland Courthouse's accessibility, parking, driving directions, public transit, hotels and other helpful links, please visit our website: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov, click on "Court Information" on the right hand side of our main page, then select the Oakland link under "Address and Jurisdiction". The main telephone number for the Oakland Division is 510 637-3530. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 3, 2009 Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Jointly Submitted filed by City of Richmond, East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (von Loewenfeldt, Michael) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 29 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 5, 2009, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 19, 2009 Filing 28 STIPULATION re 27 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Clarification/Reconsideration by City of Richmond, East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (von Loewenfeldt, Michael) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 5, 2009 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2009 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 8/5/2009) re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Re 22 24 Administrative Motions (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 24 MOTION Administrative Relief to Present Oral Testimony at Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kelly A. Corcoran, # 2 Proposed Order)(Corcoran, Kelly) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re 22 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Declarations In Opposition to Preliminary Injunction motion filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Corcoran, Kelly) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 28, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Declarations In Opposition to Preliminary Injunction motion filed by City of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 21, 2009 Filing 21 EXHIBITS re 20 Reply Memorandum EXHIBIT A TO JEFFREY HERSON DECLARATION filed byJeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 20 ) (Corcoran, Kelly) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 Filing 20 Reply Memorandum re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Herson)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Motion for Preliminary Injunction and [Proposed] Order filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 18 Request for Judicial Notice In Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity of Richmond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Richard Mitchell In support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 15, 2009 Filing 16 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 19 . *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by City of Richmond. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/15/2009) Modified on 7/16/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint byCity of Richmond. (Zinn, Matthew) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
June 16, 2009 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson re 13 Stipulation and Order (Corcoran, Kelly) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/15/2009. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set to 8/5/2009 at 9:00 A.M., before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 12 STIPULATION and Order Continuing Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Corcoran, Kelly) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 11, 2009 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 10 Proposed Order, 9 Request for Judicial Notice, 7 Declaration in Support, 8 Declaration in Support (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 10 Proposed Order re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 9 Request for Judicial Notice re 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 6 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 8 Declaration of Bahram Farahi in Support of 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 6 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 7 Declaration of Jeffrey Herson in Support of 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byEast Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. (Related document(s) 6 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 9, 2009 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint (Corcoran, Kelly) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by East Bay Outdoor, Inc., Jeffrey Herson (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009) (far, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Richmond. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2009. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2009 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
June 5, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Richmond ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611032977). DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filed byJeffrey Herson, East Bay Outdoor, Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/16/2009: # 1 Complaint) (far, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herson et al v. City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Herson
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Outdoor, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John von Loewenfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?