Jurgens v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Monika Jurgens
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02530
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for defendants to file answer or responsive pleading to seven days after MDL transfer decision; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/18/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 9/21/2009 for defendant file responsive pleadings; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/20/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting re 7 Stipulation To Extend Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading (Ext. to 8/21/09 for Johnson & Johnson) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/17/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jurgens v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monika Jurgens
Represented By: Paul Daniel Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?