July 1, 2011 |
Filing
83
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG; DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 1, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
|
June 20, 2011 |
Filing
81
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 24, 2011 to August 26, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
|
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
80
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO SNC INVESTMENTS, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 16, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
|
March 31, 2011 |
Filing
74
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission shall have until June 30, 2011 to serve defendant Chung with the summons and complaint. In the event plaintiff is unable to effectuate serv ice of process by June 30, 2011 and thereafter files a motion seeking a further extension of time to serve defendant Chung, plaintiff is directed to show therein how it would be harmed if its claims against Chung were dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 31, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
|
March 15, 2011 |
Filing
72
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 18, 2011 to June 24, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. All parties shall appear on June 24, 2011 telephonically. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 15, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
|
January 10, 2011 |
Filing
70
ORDER CONTINUING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 10, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
|
December 30, 2010 |
Filing
68
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG. Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission shall have until March 31, 2011 to serve defendant Jin K. Chung with the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 30, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
64
ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY, VACATING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Discovery is stayed until after defendant Peter C. Son is sentenced in CR 09-0755 DLJ. The parties shall inform the Court of the status of the cri minal sentencing no later than November 26, 2010. The non-expert discovery cutoff, expert discovery cutoff, dispositive motion filing deadline, meet and confer deadline, pretrial conference, and trial dates are vacated. The Case Management Conferenc e is continued from October 29, 2010 to January 14, 2011, and will be conducted telephonically. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 7, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 26, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
|
September 29, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG. Plaintiff shall have until December 31, 2010 to serve defendant Chung with the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
|
July 12, 2010 |
Filing
58
ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/12/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
|
July 8, 2010 |
Filing
57
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY DISCOVERY AND CONTINUE PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Discovery is stayed until after defendant Peter C. Son is sentenced on July 30, 2010. The parties shall inform the Court no later than August 6, 2010 about the statu s of the criminal sentencing and whether a Settlement Conference will be required. The deadline to designate experts is continued to October 1, 2010. The non-expert and expert discovery cutoff dates are continued to October 29, 2010. The deadline to file dispositive motions is continued to December 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker for Maxine M. Chesney on July 7, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
|
April 2, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG. Plaintiff shall have until June 30, 2010 to serve defendant Chung. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
50
PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 1/25/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
|
January 19, 2010 |
Filing
48
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The application, filed by plaintiff in 9-2555 MMC, for a telephonic case management conference is granted, and the Case Management Conference in SEC v Son, 9-2554, and in USCFTC v SNC, 9-2555, will be conducted by telephone on January 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 19, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
|
December 23, 2009 |
Filing
46
ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG. The deadline for plaintiff to serve defendant Jin K. Chung is extended to March 31, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 23, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
|
November 19, 2009 |
Filing
42
ORDER. Defendant Peter Son's deadline to provide an accounting according to the preliminary injunction is extended to January 12, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 19, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing
32
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; VACATING JULY 7, 2009 HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
|
June 19, 2009 |
Filing
27
ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST DEFENDANT JIN K. CHUNG. Defendant Jin K. Chung shall show cause, on July 7, 2009 at 4:00 p.m., why a preliminary injunction should not be granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 19, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
|
June 10, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants Peter C. Son, Jin K. Chung, SNC Asset Management, Inc., and SNC Investments, Inc., and each of them, shall appear before the Honorable Maxine M. Chesney, Judge of the United States District Court, to show cause, if the re be any, why a preliminary injunction should not be granted extending the temporary restraining order pending the determination of this action. Any declarations, affidavits, points and authorities, or other submissions in support of, or in oppositi on to, the issuance of such an Order shall be filed with the Court and delivered to the Commission's counsel and the offices of each of the defendants or their attorneys no later than two o'clock p.m. PDT on June 17, 2009. Any reply papers shall be filed with the Court and delivered to opposing counsel no later than Three o'clock p.m. PDT on June 19, 2009. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/22/2009 03:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 6/17/2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/10/09. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
|