J & J Sports Productions, Inc., v. Reman
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.,
Defendant: Robert Floyd Reman
Case Number: 3:2009cv02560
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 2, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; VACATING DEADLINES AND DATES; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The deadlines and dates in the Pretrial Preparation Order are vacated. The Case Management Conference is continued from November 5, 2010 to December 10, 2010, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 1, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 3/29/2010. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 5, 2010 to March 19, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 29, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER; SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiff is directed to file any Amended Complaint no later than November 13, 2009. The Case Management Con ference is continued from December 11, 2009 to February 5, 2010; a Joint Case Management Statement, or a Separate Case Management Conference if no defendant has appeared, shall be filed no later than January 29, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 25, 2009 to December 11, 2009. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order on defendant and file a certification of service no later than September 24, 2009. Plaintiff is ordered to file, no later than October 16, 2009, an application for default judgment or a statement indicating why it should not be required to do so. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc., v. Reman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.,
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Floyd Reman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?