Apostol v. Castro Valley Unified School District, et al
Plaintiff: Romeo V. Apostol
Defendant: Castro Valley Unified School District, Jim Fitzpatrick, Sherri Beatz, Charlotte Irwin, Jerry Green, Mike Miller, Tim DeForest, CSEA Union Representative, CSEA, Chapter 7 and Rob Phillips
Case Number: 3:2009cv02676
Filed: June 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING 134 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE: SEALED SETTLEMENT TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/21/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER re 127 Letter filed by Charlotte Irwin, Sherri Beatz, Tim DeForest, Castro Valley Unified School District. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/16/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYU FOR FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/27/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 111 MOTION to Continue to Continue September 16, 2011 deadline for, and hearing date of, motion for summary judgment. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffr ey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/5/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) Modified on 8/25/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RE 100 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Responses due by 8/19/2011. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/23/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 76 Stipulation REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 61 Stipulation TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR THE CLOSE OF DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 28, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 56 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (CSEA Defendants Only). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/15/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 53 Stipulation TO CONTINUE COMPLETION OF EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/13/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING 49 (Amended) Stipulation regarding extension to respond to plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/23/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/3/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/18/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation re Defendant's Response. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DENYING REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/12/2009 ORDERING 2 CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California for further proceedings, including a ruling on plaintiff Romeo V. Apostol's application to proceed in forma pauperis and motion for appointment of counsel. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apostol v. Castro Valley Unified School District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeo V. Apostol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castro Valley Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Fitzpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Beatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim DeForest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSEA Union Representative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSEA, Chapter 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?