Ringcentral, Inc. v. Quimby et al
Plaintiff: Ringcentral, Inc.
Defendant: Bill Quimby and Tollfreenumbers.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02693
Filed: June 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/2/2012 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/27/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/9/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT. Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/18/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER RE: 58 VACATING HEARING AND REQUESTING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/10. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE: 49 . 50 CONDITIONALLY GRANTING STAY OF ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/19/2010, (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE: 43 . Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/8/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/08/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringcentral, Inc. v. Quimby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ringcentral, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron K. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Quimby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tollfreenumbers.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?