Fobbs v. New Haven Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Alvett Fobbs
Defendant: New Haven Unified School District and City of Union City
Case Number: 3:2009cv02723
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 317 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/27/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 290 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 279 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/31/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/9/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying 225 Motion for Class Certification (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Judge Hamilton (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 188 STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFFS' TO FILE REVISED FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT re 187 Stipulation filed by Alvett Fobbs. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/17/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 172 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 163 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 DISCOVERY ORDER. Further Discovery Hearing set for 5/14/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated discovery Statement due by 5/12/2010. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/3/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CONFERNCE. Discovery Hearing re-set for 4/23/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/15/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING re 87 Letter Extending Time to File Joint Discovery Plan filed by City of Union City. Time extended to 4/2/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/29/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Discovery Hearing set for 4/16/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/10/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/27/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE and ORDER Continuing Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/23/2009. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 25 Motion to Consolidate Cases (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/5/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fobbs v. New Haven Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvett Fobbs
Represented By: Pamela Yvette Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Haven Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Union City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?