Bill Graham Archives LLC et al v. F.E.A. Merchandising, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bill Graham Archives LLC and Norton LLC
Defendant: F.E.A. Merchandising, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02747
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER re 50 Letter filed by F.E.A. Merchandising, Inc., 51 Letter filed by Bill Graham Archives LLC, Norton LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/26/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/20/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/14/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 12, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 5, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING PRIVATE ADR DEADLINE BY 30 DAYS. The deadline for completion of private ADR is continued to April 14, 2010. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 16, 2010. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/9/2009. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE BY TELEPHONE AT OCTOBER 9, 2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 6, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER APPROVING SELECTION OF ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bill Graham Archives LLC et al v. F.E.A. Merchandising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Graham Archives LLC
Represented By: Erin Rose Ranahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norton LLC
Represented By: Erin Rose Ranahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.E.A. Merchandising, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?