Watkins v. Evans
Petitioner: Nathaniel Watkins
Respondent: M. S. Evans
Case Number: 3:2009cv03071
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Respondent shall file a response to the petition no later than August 1, 2011. Within thirty days of the date such response is filed, petitioner shall file a nd serve any traverse or opposition thereto. The Clerk is directed to change the caption from Nathaniel Watkins v. M.S. Evans to Nathaniel Watkins v. Terri Gonzalez. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 30, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 11 MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AS UNTIMELY; DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE ANSWER ADDRESSING REMAINING CLAIMS; GRANTING 15 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 4, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathaniel Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. S. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?