Watters v. Winnebago Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mareth Watters and Mike Watters
Defendant: Winnebago Industries, JC's RV, Caterpillar, Inc. and National City Bank
Case Number: 3:2009cv03075
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER APPROVING DISMISSAL OF CROSS-CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 10, 2010 Filing 47 STIPULATION and [Proposed] ORDER for Dismissal of Cross-Claims by National City Bank(a corporation). (Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 10, 2010 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Dismissal w/Prejudice of All Defendants and Order by Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Le Pere, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 44 ANSWER to Crossclaim AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL byWinnebago Industries, Inc.. (Le Pere, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 43 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Caterpillar, Inc.(a corporation). (Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 Filing 42 Defendant, Cross-Defendant Caterpillar Inc.'s ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by National City Bank byCaterpillar, Inc.(a corporation). (Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR CATERPILLAR TO RESPOND TO NATIONAL CITY BANK'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [re #38 Stipulation filed by Caterpillar, Inc.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/13/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Winnebago Industries to Respond to National City Bank's First Amended Cross-Complaint. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/11/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Filing 39 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Le Pere, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 7, 2010 Filing 38 STIPULATION re #36 Crossclaim Stipulation to Extend Time For Caterpillar Inc. to File Responsive Pleading to National City Bank's First Amended Cross-Complaint by Caterpillar, Inc.(a corporation). (Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
December 22, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE by National City Bank(a corporation) re Settlement (Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 36 Amended CROSSCLAIM against Caterpillar, Inc., JC's RV, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. Filed byNational City Bank. (Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re #33 Notice (Other) filed by Mareth Watters, Mike Watters]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/18/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 18, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 Filing 33 NOTICE by Mareth Watters, Mike Watters Notice of Settlement (Korper, Rene) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting #29 Motion to Amend/Correct ; National City Bank is required to E-FILE the amended document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 31 Proposed Order re #29 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Crossclaim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Crossclaim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof by National City Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 30 Declaration of Marcus T. Brown in Support of #29 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Crossclaim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Crossclaim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed byNational City Bank. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Crossclaim and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by National City Bank. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 28 Summons Issued as to JC's RV. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/30/2010. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2010 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 8/5/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/15/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 26 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/15/2009). Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2009. Discovery due by 6/30/2010. Motions due by 8/6/2010. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2010 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2010 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2009)
October 14, 2009 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 8, 2009 Filing 24 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Le Pere, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES by Winnebago Industries, Inc. of Interested Parties by Defendant Winnebago Industries, Inc. (Murphy, Thomas) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2009 Filing 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Winnebago Industries, Inc. (Murphy, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Murphy, Thomas) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 18, 2009 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiffs Mike and Mareth Watters (Hubscher, Sophie) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 10, 2009 Filing 18 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM byWinnebago Industries, Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
August 28, 2009 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 Filing 16 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM #14 Crossclaim byCaterpillar, Inc.. (Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by National City Bank identifying Corporate Parent PNC Financial Services Group, Inc. for National City Bank, National City Bank. (Brown, Marcus) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 14 CROSSCLAIM against Caterpillar, Inc., JC's RV, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. Filed byNational City Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Gunn, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 13 VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiffs byNational City Bank. (Attachments: #1 (signed) Verification, #2 Proof of Service)(Gunn, Brian) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 12 Joinder in Notice of Removal of Action by Defendant Caterpillar, Inc., by National City Bank. (Gunn, Brian) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
July 21, 2009 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mike Watters, Mareth Watters re #10 Jury Demand filed by Plaintiffs (Hubscher, Sophie) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 20, 2009 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mike Watters. (Hubscher, Sophie) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Proof of Service of Notice to All Parties and State Court of Removal of Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Proof of Service of Initial and Standing Orders On All Parties By Mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ikejiri, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 8, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #6 ADR Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Filing 6 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/8/2009. Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2009 11:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE Statement by Caterpillar, Inc.. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009) (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Caterpillar, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009) (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Caterpillar, Inc.. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009) (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Caterpillar, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009) (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is VG09452790. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 44611003853). Filed byCaterpillar, Inc.. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009) (sis, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watters v. Winnebago Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winnebago Industries
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Murphy
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Le Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC's RV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Ikejiri
Represented By: Steven Dwight DiSaia
Represented By: Daniel W. Bir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Bank
Represented By: Marcus T. Brown
Represented By: Stuart Bruce Wolfe
Represented By: Brian H. Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mareth Watters
Represented By: Sophie Alexandra Hubscher
Represented By: Rene Korper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Watters
Represented By: Rene Korper
Represented By: Sophie Alexandra Hubscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?