Brown v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Thurman E. Brown
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv03401
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 6/9/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 31 Joint Case Management Statement filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/3/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 29 Stipulation filed by Thurman E. Brown. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/10/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING DISCOVERY re 21 Stipulation filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/21/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 19 Stipulation filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/15/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION re 17 Stipulation filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/14/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman E. Brown
Represented By: Anthony Steven Petru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?