Employers Insurance Company of Wausau v. PepsiAmericas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Defendant: PepsiAmericas, Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company, Continental Insurance Company, Argonaut Insurance Company, Northwestern National Insurance Company of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, Century Indemnity Company, Allstate Insurance Company and One Beacon Insurance Group
Case Number: 3:2009cv03419
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER of Dismissal as to all remaining actions, cross-actions and counter-actions without prejudice re 115 Stipulation filed by One Beacon Insurance Group. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER for Dismissal with prejudice as to PepsiAmericas, Inc. re 106 Stipulation filed by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, PepsiAmericas, Inc. and PepsiAmericas, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/12/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER for extension of time to file response to cross complaint re 100 Stipulation filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/13/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting re 96 Stipulation For Extension of time to file A Response to Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/8/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER for extension of time to file response to cross complaint re 79 Stipulation filed by PepsiAmericas, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/05/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting re 69 Stipulation Extending Time To File Response To Complaint (Ext. to 10/6/09). filed by Allstate Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/29/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting re 47 Stipulation For Extension of Time to file Response to Complaint (Due: 9/18/09), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA, PepsiAmericas, Inc., Travelers Indemnity Company, Continental Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Northwestern National Insurance Company of Milwaukee, Wisconsin. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/9/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER to extend time to respond re 42 Stipulation, filed by Century Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Time for Century Indemnity Company and One Beacon Insurance Group to Respond to the Complaint to 8/28/09 (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time to file response to complaint. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/06/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau v. PepsiAmericas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Valarie Hastings Jonas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiAmericas, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Anton Zevnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argonaut Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern National Insurance Company of Milwaukee, Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Co. of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Beacon Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?