May v. City of Richmond
Plaintiff: Judith C. May
Defendant: City of Richmond
Case Number: 3:2009cv03461
Filed: July 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/10/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR RULING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/29/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 37 Support for Waiving Statute of Limitations and Filing of an Appeal. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION FROM CITY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/14/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith C. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?