Louisiana Pacific Corporation v. Money Market 1 Institutional Investment Dealer et al
Plaintiff: Louisiana Pacific Corporation
Defendant: Money Market 1 Institutional Investment Dealer, Merrill Lynch & Co, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv03529
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/14/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 279 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 6, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER GRANTING 268 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER GRANTING 266 STIPULATION Continuing Further Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER regarding (1) LP and DBSI's five pending joint discovery letters, and (2) LP's and DBSI's administrative motions for leave to file portions of three of the letters under seal. See order for details. The November 15, 2012 hearing on the joint letters is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/14/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 257 STIPULATION Regarding Scheduling. Jury Selection set for 7/10/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER regading (1) LP and DBSI's two joint discovery dispute letters dated August 9, 2012, (2) LP AND DBSI's joint discovery dispute letter dated September 6, 2012, and (3) DBSI's two administrative motions for leave to file portions o f the August 9, 2012 letters under seal. DBSI shall file the letters under seal in accordance with the procedures set forth in Civil Local Rule 79-5 and General Order 62. The court DENIES DBSI's requests for an order quashing LP's notice of DBSI's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition and requiring LP to re-designate certain documents. The court GRANTS DBSI's request for an order compelling LP to provide responses to DBSI's contention interrogatory answers. LP shall respond to DBSI's contention interrogatories within 7 calendar days from the date that LP takes DBSI's Rule 30(b)(6) deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/10/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER GRANTING 214 STIPULATION Expanding Deposition and Interrogatory Limits. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/12/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING 206 STIPULATION Rescheduling Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/27/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER GRANTING 204 STIPULATION rescheduling pretrial matters. Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2012. Discovery due by 9/14/2012. Expert Witness List due by 12/3/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2012 01:30 PM in Court room 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/3/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISCOVERY. Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING 181 STIPULATION Regarding Document Production. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
March 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 178 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated (Proposed) Protective Order filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/9/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING 174 STIPULATION selecting Private ADR.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING 167 Joint Request for Case Management Conference). Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING 142 Stipulation Order Extending Defendant Money Market 1 Institutional Investment Dealer's Time to Answer the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/17/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING 139 StipulationOrder Extending Defendant Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.'s Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint, Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limits Established By the Court's Civil Standing Orders and Setting Brief ing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING 135 Stipulation Extending Defendant Money Market 1 Institutional Investment Dealer's Time to Answer the Anticipated Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/23/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING 133 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 13, 2011. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 91 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion to Strike; denying 95 Motion to Dismiss; denying 98 Motion to Strike; granting 121 Motion for Leave to File; granting 123 Motion; granting 128 Motion for Leave to File; granting 129 Motion for Leave to File; granting 131 Motion for Leave to File. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/24/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/11/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 89 STIPULATION FOR Leave to Exceed Page Limits Established by the Court's Civil Standing Orders and Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Motions to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/8/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Amended Order Denying 24 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 22, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 24 MOTION to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 26, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE. ORDER re Reply. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 26, 2010. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (jswlc2, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER REOPENING CURRENT ACTION AND SETTING MOTION ON CALENDAR. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/5/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re 80 Letter and MDL Action. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 21, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER VACATING HEARING AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
October 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KEVIN J. MILLER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation Extending Time to File Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 6, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re 24 MOTION to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 24, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Pacific Corporation v. Money Market 1 Institutional Investment Dealer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Pacific Corporation
Represented By: Andrew C. Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Money Market 1 Institutional Investment Dealer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch & Co, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?