Turner v. Craig et al
Plaintiff: Michael Turner
Defendant: Christopher Craig, J. Turner and P. Phan
Case Number: 3:2009cv03652
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF WAYNE JOHNSON (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Defendants to refile document99 - properly redacted. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RE: MOTION TO QUASH (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RE: LETTER BRIEF ON DISCOVERY ISSUE (DOC. 82) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND STAY PENDING APPEAL, AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL FINDINGS re 58 , 61 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS with leave to amend re 35 . Amended Complaint is due 3/22/10. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER continuing cmc to 4/2/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS with leave to amend. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Craig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Turner
Represented By: Wayne Jerome Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?