Hernandez v. Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Hernandez
Defendant: Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc., Armando Chavez, Christina Savala, Dane Robert MacArthur, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, Chase Home Finance, LLC, First Security Financial Group, Inc., James John Chapman, Manny Rivera, Peter Consulter, American Mortgage Network, Wachovia Capital Finance Corporation, Vertice, Luminent Capital Mortgage and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 3:2009cv03658
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2010 Filing 112 Reply Memorandum re 102 First MOTION to Dismiss Claims Contained in Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 111 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motions Hearing reset for 8/26/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 109 Motion to Appear by Telephone (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 109 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 Filing 108 Reply to Opposition re 99 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byChase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 6, 2010 Filing 107 Memorandum in Opposition to 99 Motion to Dismiss filed by Antonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/6/2010) Modified on 8/9/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 Filing 106 Memorandum in Opposition to 102 AMN Motion to Dismiss filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/6/2010) Modified on 8/9/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2010 Filing 105 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byJames John Chapman, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, Residential Mortgage Capital. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 14, 2010 Filing 104 EXHIBITS re 102 First MOTION to Dismiss Claims Contained in Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Related document(s) 102 ) (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 14, 2010 Filing 103 Brief re 102 First MOTION to Dismiss Claims Contained in Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Related document(s) 102 ) (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 14, 2010 Filing 102 First MOTION to Dismiss Claims Contained in Second Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can be Granted filed by American Mortgage Network. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of RBS Financial Products, Inc. from Second Amended Complaint by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 100 Request for Judicial Notice re 99 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byChase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Related document(s) 99 ) (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 24, 2010 Filing 98 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against American Mortgage Network, James John Chapman, Chase Home Finance, LLC, Armando Chavez, First Security Financial Group, Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, Dane Robert MacArthur, Residential Mortgage Capital, Manny Rivera, Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc.. Filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 6/24/2010) Modified on 6/25/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 96 Order (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 10, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2010. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Second Amended Complaint due 6/24/10. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on June 10, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010) Modified on 6/11/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2010 Filing 95 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2010 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 6/4/2010) re 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Mortgage Network, 85 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, ***Motions terminated: 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Mortgage Network, 85 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA.. Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2010. (Court Reporter James Yeomans.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 93 Motion to Appear by Telephone (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 93 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 92 Reply to Opposition re 85 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed byChase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
April 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 57 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
April 29, 2010 Filing 91 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motions to Dismiss Hearing reset for 6/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 90 Memorandum in Opposition re 85 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 89 Reply Memorandum re 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 88 NOTICE by Antonio Hernandez of Errata Re 87 Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Complaint by AMN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 4/19/2010) Modified on 4/20/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2010 Filing 87 Memorandum in Opposition re 81 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 86 Request for Judicial Notice re 85 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed byChase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Related document(s) 85 ) (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 84 Proposed Order re 81 MOTION to Dismiss by American Mortgage Network. (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 83 Request for Judicial Notice re 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Related document(s) 81 ) (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 29, 2010 Filing 82 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 81 Motion to Dismiss Claims Contained in the First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Fed. R. Civ. Proc. Rule 12(b)(6) filed by American Mortgage Network. (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 3/29/2010) Modified on 3/30/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2010 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Mortgage Network. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 26, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of RBS Financial Products, Inc. by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER extending time to respond to first amended complaint re 78 Stipulation filed by Antonio Hernandez. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/23/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 15, 2010 Filing 78 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint; [Proposed] Order by Antonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 77 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held, case did not settle. (Date Filed: 3/11/2010). (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Charlels R. Breyer granting 74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (B. B. Klubes) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RBS Financial Products, Inc. re 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611043433.) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Filing 74 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Benjamin B. Klubes) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611043433.) filed by RBS Financial Products, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 9, 2010 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 3/10/10 has been taken off calendar. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ALLOWING CLAIMS REPRESENTATIVE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re settlement conference statement by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 3/4/2010) Modified on 3/5/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 Filing 71 Application to Allow Claims Representative to Appear Telephonically at Settlement Conference by American Mortgage Network. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 3/3/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2010 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Mortgage Network, James John Chapman, Chase Home Finance, LLC, Armando Chavez, First Security Financial Group, Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, Dane Robert MacArthur, RBS Financial Products, Inc., Residential Mortgage Capital, Manny Rivera, Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc.. Filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Luminent Capital Mortgage, Inc. by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 10, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 3/11/2010 09:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/10/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 5, 2010 Filing 66 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/5/2010 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 2/5/2010) re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Complain filed by Residential Mortgage Capital, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, James John Chapman, 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Mortgage Network. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2010)
February 2, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 2/2/10. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 3/10/10 at 9:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 63 Motion to Appear by Telephone (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 28, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by James John Chapman, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, Residential Mortgage Capital. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 61 Motion to Appear by Telephone (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 26, 2010 Filing 61 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by RBS Financial Products, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sahatjian, Richard) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 59 Motion to Appear by Telephone (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 20, 2010 Filing 59 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 15, 2010 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference has been rescheduled for 2/2/10 at 9:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 13, 2010 ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 1/13/10 at 9:30 a.m. has been taken off calendar and will be rescheduled at a later date. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (sgd, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2010 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 57 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Filing 57 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2010 10:00 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Filing 56 Reply Memorandum in Support of 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 1/6/2010) Modified on 1/7/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2009 Filing 55 Reply to Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Complain filed byJames John Chapman, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, Residential Mortgage Capital. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 25, 2009 Filing 54 Memorandum in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 12/25/2009)
December 24, 2009 Filing 53 Memorandum in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 12/24/2009) Modified on 12/28/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2009 Filing 52 Letter from Dane McArthur. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 51 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Norine, Jonz) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 50 CLERKS NOTICE, CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/15/2010 10:00 AM. Motions Hearing set for 1/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 49 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re motion to appear telephonically)(Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 48 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Sahatjian, Richard) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 47 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sahatjian, Richard) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 17, 2009 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by James John Chapman, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, Residential Mortgage Capital. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Certificate of Service, # 6 Proposed Order)(Seigel, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/17/2009) Modified on 12/28/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 17, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 11/17/09. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 1/13/2010 at 9:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 13, 2009 Filing 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Antonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER extending time to respond to complaint re 42 Stipulation filed by RBS Financial Products, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/12/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 12, 2009 Filing 43 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/17/09 at 11:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 10, 2009 Filing 42 STIPULATION Extending Defendant RBS Financial Products, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Complaint, by RBS Financial Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Sahatjian, Richard) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 41 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 39 Reply to Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed byChase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 37 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 35 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
October 30, 2009 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antonio Hernandez. RBS Financial Products, Inc. served on 10/21/2009, answer due 11/10/2009. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 10/30/2009) Modified on 11/2/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2009 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonio Hernandez re 32 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Ponits and Authorities filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 31 Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to American Mortgage Network, James John Chapman, Chase Home Finance, LLC, Armando Chavez, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, Miguel Angel Lopez-Sotelo, Luminent Capital Mortgage, Dane Robert MacArthur, RBS Financial Products, Inc., Residential Mortgage Capital, Manny Rivera, Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2009 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amendment to Complaint Substituting True Name of Defendant for Fictitious Name against American Mortgage Network, James John Chapman, Chase Home Finance, LLC, Armando Chavez, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, Luminent Capital Mortgage, Dane Robert MacArthur, Manny Rivera, Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc.. Filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED Amendment to Complaint Substituting True Names of Defendants for Fictitious Names against American Mortgage Network, James John Chapman, Chase Home Finance, LLC, Armando Chavez, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, Luminent Capital Mortgage, Dane Robert MacArthur, Manny Rivera, Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc.. Filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Documents 24, 25 and 26. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 26 Request for Judicial Notice re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Related document(s) 24 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2009: # 1 Exhibits A - H) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed byAmerican Mortgage Network. (Related document(s) 24 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim upon which relief can be granted filed by American Mortgage Network. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2009 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT Amendment to Complaint Substituting True Names of Defendants For Fictitious Names against American Mortgage Network, James John Chapman, Chase Home Finance, LLC, Armando Chavez, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA, Luminent Capital Mortgage, Dane Robert MacArthur, Manny Rivera, Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc.. Filed byAntonio Hernandez. (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 29, 2009 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Vertice as a Party Defendant Without Prejudice [FRCP § 41(a)(1)(i)] by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 29, 2009 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Wachovia Capital Finance Corporation as a Party Defendant Without Prejudice [FRCP § 41(a)(1)(i)] by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 20 Proposed Order re 18 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Ponits and Authorities by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice re 18 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Ponits and Authorities filed byChase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. (Related document(s) 18 ) (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 17, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint; Memorandum of Ponits and Authorities filed by Chase Home Finance, LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Yoo, Sung-Min) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 9, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Peter Consulter as a Party Defendant Without Prejudice [FRCP § 41(a)(1)(i)] by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 9, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of First Security Financial Group, Inc. as a Party Defendant Without Prejudice [FRCP § 41(a)(1)(i) by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 9, 2009 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonio Hernandez re 13 Clerks Notice re Initial Case Management Conference; Standing Order (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Christina Savala as a Party Defendant Without Prejudice [FRCP § 41(a)(1)(i)] by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 1, 2009 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2009 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Marilyn H. Patel no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/09. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Wells Fargo Bank as a Party Defendant Without Prejudice [FRCP §41(a)(1)(i) by Antonio Hernandez (Babb, Suzanne) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/25/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Marilyn H. Patel for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/09. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 24, 2009 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 17, 2009 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. All parties are instructed to sign and file the enclosed consent or declination form within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this notice, indicating whether they consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge in this matter. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 Filing 6 Request for Judicial Notice re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Against Wells Fargo Bank for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byWells Fargo Bank. (Related document(s) 5 ) (Malcolm, William) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Against Wells Fargo Bank for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Wells Fargo Bank. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Malcolm, William) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Filing 4 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wells Fargo Bank.. (Malcolm, William) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 10, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2009. Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2009 01:30 PM. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
August 10, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009) (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; No Process from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is SCV 245248. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 34611035364). Filed by Wells Fargo Bank. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2009: # 1 pages 17-31, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Hernandez
Represented By: Christopher G. Costin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter West Capital Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Savala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane Robert MacArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Security Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James John Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Consulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Capital Finance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luminent Capital Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?