Tecza v. University of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Jason Tecza
Defendant: University of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2009cv03808
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 62 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/28/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: [27 GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 05/03/2010. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 3/4/2010 until 5/27/2010 at 3:30 p.m. re doc 30 filed by University of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/22/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The case management conference currently set for 1/21/2010 is hereby continued to 3/4/2010 at 3:30 PM re doc 22 filed by University of San Francisco. The parties are directed to file a joint statement one week prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/14/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecza v. University of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Tecza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of San Francisco
Represented By: Michael Joseph Vartain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?