Evenflow, Inc. v. Domains by Proxy, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Evenflow, Inc.
Defendant: Domains by Proxy, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv03824
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2009 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evenflow, Inc. re 12 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Evenflow, Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evenflow, Inc. re 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Evenflow, Inc. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 9 SUMMONS on Amended Complaint Issued as to Defendant Giri Nirkondar. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Giri Nirkondar. Filed by Evenflow, Inc.. (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Evenflow, Inc... (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 1, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE by Evenflow, Inc. - Notice of Deposit of Registrar Certificate (Kronenberger, Karl) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
August 20, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2009 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties Filed by Plaintiff Evenflow, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 11/30/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 12/7/2009 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Domains by Proxy, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 20, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark Infringment & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued]against Domains by Proxy, Inc., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611035734] Filed by Plaintiff Evenflow, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evenflow, Inc. v. Domains by Proxy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evenflow, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domains by Proxy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?