Kirbyson v. Tesoro Corporation et al
Plaintiff: George L. Kirbyson
Defendant: Tesoro Corporation, Bruce Smith, Dan Porter, William Bodnar, Bill Reitzel, Daniel Carlson, Rick Rios, Tammy Meamber, Diane Daniels, Larry Angel, United Steelworkers International Union Local 5, Jeff Clark and Steve Rojek
Case Number: 3:2009cv03990
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/29/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating pretrial conference, hearing on motions in limine and trial date. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/12/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 JURY TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/14/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 73 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 75 Motion for Summary Judgment (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER Jury Selection set for 12/5/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/21/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER Enlarging time for Discovery and Motions. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/7/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER DENYING Stipulation to continue the trial date.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/2/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 42 Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 36 Motion for Sanctions (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CORRECTED ORDER (correcting case number) by Judge Samuel Conti granting 20 Motion to Dismiss; granting 22 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/2/2010. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirbyson v. Tesoro Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L. Kirbyson
Represented By: Jesse Manuel Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Bodnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Reitzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Meamber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Steelworkers International Union Local 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rojek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?